EP3382489 - TOUR GUIDE ROBOT AND MOVING AREA CALIBRATION METHOD, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ping An Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/19] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states Ping An Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Huaili 23F, Ping'an Financial Center No. 5033 Yitian Road Fu'an community of Futian Street Futian district Shenzhen City, Guangdong Province / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Bao 23F, Ping'an Financial Center No. 5033 Yitian Road Fu'an community of Futian Street Futian district Shenzhen City, Guangdong Province / CN | 03 /
LAI, Zhongcheng 23F, Ping'an Financial Center No. 5033 Yitian Road Fu'an community of Futian Street Futian district Shenzhen City, Guangdong Province / CN | 04 /
XIAO, Jing 23F, Ping'an Financial Center No. 5033 Yitian Road Fu'an community of Futian Street Futian district Shenzhen City, Guangdong Province / CN | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/40] | 01 /
JIA, Huaili Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Bao Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | |||
03 /
LAI, Zhongcheng Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | |||
04 /
XIAO, Jing Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/19] | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Alcalá, 26, 5ª Planta 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2018/40] | Inal, Aysegul Seda Yalciner Patent and Consulting Ltd. Tunus Cad. 85/4 06680 Kavaklidere, Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 17860420.3 | 30.06.2017 | [2018/40] | WO2017CN91376 | Priority number, date | CN201610899726 | 14.10.2016 Original published format: CN201610899726 | [2018/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018068537 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3382489 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3382489 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B25J5/00, G08B5/36 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B25J9/1666 (KR);
G05D1/0236 (CN,US);
B25J11/0005 (EP,US);
B25J11/008 (EP,US);
B25J9/1676 (KR);
B25J9/1692 (KR);
G05D1/0242 (CN,US);
G05D1/0255 (CN,US);
G08B5/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/40] | G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREMDENFÜHRERROBOTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWEGUNGSBEREICHSKALIBRIERUNG, COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2018/40] | English: | TOUR GUIDE ROBOT AND MOVING AREA CALIBRATION METHOD, COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2018/40] | French: | ROBOT DE GUIDAGE DE VISITE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE DE ZONE DE DÉPLACEMENT, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2018/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2018 | Translation filed | 28.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 28.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | IE | 30.06.2023 | LU | 30.06.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
IE | 30.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
IE | 30.06.2023 | ||
LU | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006195226 (MATSUKAWA YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14 * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0221] * * paragraph [0224] - paragraph [0227] * * paragraph [0280] * * paragraph [0286] * * paragraph [0294] * * paragraph [0303] - paragraph [0307] * * paragraph [0337] * * figures 17b,18 *; | [XI]JP2013107184 (UNIV TOKYO DENKI) [X] 1,6,12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0045] * * figure - *[I] 2,7,10,11,13 | International search | [A]JP2007102488 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-19* , entire document *; | [XY]WO2009063318 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 6, 7, 10-13, 16, 17 * , description, paragraphs [0002]-[0013] and [0022]-[0035], and figures 1-6, description, paragraphs [0002]-[0013] and [0022]-[0035], and figures 1-6 * [Y] 3, 4, 8, 14, 15, 18; | [A]CN103192414 (SHENYANG SIASUN ROBOT & AUTOMA) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [Y]EP2837473 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3, 4, 8, 14, 15, 18 * , description, paragraphs [0020] and [0021], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN205334234U (UNIV SHANDONG SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [PX]CN106406312 (PING AN TECHNOLOGY SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [PX] 1-19 * , description, paragraphs [0005]-[0027] and [0037]-[0072] *; | [PX]CN206075140U (PING AN TECHNOLOGY SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [PX] 1-19 * , description, paragraphs [0005]-[0014] and [0021]-[0052] * |