EP3525792 - POWDER FOR ORAL SUSPENSION CONTAINING LAMOTRIGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aucta Pharmaceuticals 675 US Route 1 North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Enxian 347 Bromley Place East Brunswick NJ 08816 / US | 02 /
LI, Shoufeng 20 Honeyman Road Basking Ridge NJ 07920 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 17860743.8 | 11.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017US56146 | Priority number, date | US201662406624P | 11.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662406624 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071547 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525792 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/53, C07D253/075, A61K9/14, A61K9/10 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP);
A61K9/146 (EP);
A61K9/1611 (US);
A61K9/1641 (US);
A61K9/1652 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | A61K31/53, C07D253/075, A61K9/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | PULVER FÜR ORALE SUSPENSIONEN MIT LAMOTRIGIN | [2019/34] | English: | POWDER FOR ORAL SUSPENSION CONTAINING LAMOTRIGINE | [2019/34] | French: | POUDRE POUR SUSPENSION ORALE CONTENANT DE LA LAMOTRIGINE | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | 24.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 26.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/38] | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2023 | 31.10.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]GB2278057 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [I] 1-5,7-15 * pages 18,23 * * claim 14 * * the whole document *[Y] 1-5,7-15; | [XYI]WO2007054975 (PANACEA BIOTEC LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * example 15 * [Y] 1-5,7-15 [I] 1-5,7-15; | [IAY]US2010016322 (NAGARAJU NAGESH [IN], et al) [I] 1-5,7-15 * the whole document * * examples 3,7,8; tables 11-13 * [A] 6 [Y] 1-5,7-15; | [XAYI] - A PRAMEELA RANI ET AL, "FULL FACTORIAL DESIGN IN FORMULATION OF LAMOTRIGINE SUSPENSION USING LOCUST BEAN GUM", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL SCIENCES, IN, (20130101), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 0972-768X, pages 751 - 760, XP055498437 [X] 13-15 * the whole document * * tables 2-3 * [A] 6 [Y] 1-5,7-15 [I] 1-5,7-15 | [XAYI] - Loyd V. Allen Jr., "Lamotrigine 1 mg/mL Oral Suspension", (20150515), pages 1 - 3, URL: https://www.uspharmacist.com/article/lamotrigine-1-mgml-oral-suspension, (20200312), XP055676193 [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, lines 3-16 * [A] 6 [Y] 1-5,7-15 [I] 1-5,7-15 | [Y] - Herbert A. Lieberman ET AL, "Pharmaceuticals Dosages Forms: Disperse Systems", PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS. DISPERSE SYSTEMS, NEW YORK* BASEL*HONG KONG, MARCEL DEKKER, (20050101), pages 162 - 163, ISBN 978-0-8247-9713-3, XP055676507 [Y] 1-5,7-15 * table 3 * | [Y] - SHARON ZIETSMAN ET AL, "Formulation Development and Stability Studies of Aqueous Metronidazole Benzoate Suspensions Containing Various Suspending Agents", DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, US, (20070101), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:10.1080/03639040601011215, ISSN 0363-9045, pages 191 - 197, XP055625334 [Y] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * page 197, column 1, lines 12-17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03639040601011215 | International search | [Y]US5556639 (FIELDEN KRYSTYNA E [GB]) [Y] 1 * entire document *; | [A]US5861179 (HISKETT SIMON PHILIP [GB], et al) [A] 1-3, 18-20 * entire document *; | [A]WO2005051350 (TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-3, 18-20* entire document *; | [A]US2005238724 (ARONHIME JUDITH [IL], et al) [A] 1-3, 18-20 * entire document *; | [XY] - RANI et al., "Full Factorial Design in Formulation of Lamotrigine Suspension Using Locust Bean Gum", International Journal of Chemical Sciences, vol. 11, no. 2, (20130000), pages 751 - 760, URL: http://www.tsijoumals.com/articles/full-factorial-design-in-formulation-of-lamotrigine-suspension-using-Iocust-bean-gum.pdf, (20171107), XP055498437 [X] 18, 20 [Y] 1 |