EP3525841 - MICRO DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micromed Co., Ltd. 17F. No. 3 Park St. Nangang Dist. Taipei City / TW | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Po-Ying No. 135 Sec. 2 Heping W. Rd. Zhongzheng Dist. Taipei City / TW | 02 /
CHENG, Tsung-Chieh 14F. No. 6 Chonghua St. Zuoying Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | 03 /
FENG, Chia-Chi No. 135 Sec. 2 Heping W. Rd. Zhongzheng Dist. Taipei City / TW | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17862714.7 | 17.10.2017 | [2019/34] | WO2017CN106510 | Priority number, date | US201662409067P | 17.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662409067 P | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018072677 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525841 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/152, A61M5/145, A61M5/142, A61M5/158 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61M5/14224 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/14276 (EP,KR,US);
A61L31/04 (KR,US);
A61L31/08 (KR,US);
A61L31/14 (KR,US);
A61M39/0208 (KR);
A61M5/158 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2400/16 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14204 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/0216 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3303 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3337 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | A61M5/152, A61M5/145 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | MIKROABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/34] | English: | MICRO DELIVERY DEVICE | [2019/34] | French: | MICRO-DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 09.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009306594 (PANG CHANGLIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,12,15 * figures 10-12 * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0110] * [I] 3,5-11,13,14; | [XI]US2011060280 (CAFFEY SEAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,12,15 * figures 1, 2A, 2B, 3, 4 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * [I] 2,5-7,9-11,13,14; | [A]US2011275410 (CAFFEY SEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0062] *; | [XI]US2016206811 (SHIH JASON [US], et al) [X] 1,6,12,15 * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 2-5,7-11,13,14 |