EP3530076 - LED LIGHTING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B/E Aerospace, Inc. 1400 Corporate Center Way Wellington, FL 33414 / US | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAM, Luis 23 Brayton Court South South Setaukat, NY 11720 / US | 02 /
JOHANNESSEN, Eric 461 Donald Boulevard Holbrook, NY 11741 / US | 03 /
UPTON, Brendan 9 Pondview Drive, Apt. 12 East Patchogue, NY 11772 / US | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 17862895.4 | 20.10.2017 | [2019/35] | WO2017US57542 | Priority number, date | US201615331698 | 21.10.2016 Original published format: US201615331698 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018075862 | Date: | 26.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530076 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3530076 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05B45/3578 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
H05B45/3578 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/48 (US);
H05B45/50 (EP,US);
H05B47/105 (EP,US);
H05B47/24 (EP,US);
F21K9/272 (EP,US);
F21K9/275 (EP,US);
F21K9/278 (US);
F21V3/02 (EP,US);
F21Y2103/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/35] | H05B33/08, H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-BELEUCHTUNGSANORDNUNG | [2019/35] | English: | LED LIGHTING ASSEMBLY | [2019/35] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉCLAIRAGE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2019/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/35] | 01.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 03.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | LU | 20.10.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011057572 (KIT JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * paragraph [0043]; figure 3 *; | [XYI]US2014203716 (TAO HAIMIN [NL]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0084] , [0 87]; figure 4 * [Y] 4-7 [I] 3; | [Y]US2015312987 (GIBBS DUANE [US]) [Y] 7* figure 3 * | International search | [A]US2011057572 (KIT JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , see entire documents. *; | [A]US2015173138 (ROBERTS BRUCE RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-20* , see entire documents. *; | [X]US2015312987 (GIBBS DUANE [US]) [X] 1-20 * , see entire documents. * | by applicant | US2014203716 |