EP3535197 - CONTROLLED POUR BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valvoline Licensing and Intellectual Property, LLC 100 Valvoline Way Lexington, Kentucky 40509 / US | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASPER, Joseph 100 Valvoline Way Lexington, Kentucky 40509 / US | 02 /
RUBLE, Steven 100 Valvoline Way Lexington, Kentucky 40509 / US | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Locas, Davide, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17863278.2 | 13.06.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017US37082 | Priority number, date | US201615343278 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US201615343278 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018084896 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3535197 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3535197 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/20, B65D25/42, B65D51/16, B65D90/34 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B65D1/20 (EP,IL);
B65D47/32 (IL,US);
B65D1/0207 (IL,US);
B65D25/2885 (IL,US);
B65D25/42 (EP,IL,US);
B65D47/122 (IL,US);
B65D2205/02 (EP,IL)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | B65D47/32, B65D1/02, B65D1/20, B65D25/42, B65D51/16, B65D90/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLASCHE MIT KONTROLLIERTEM AUSGUSS | [2019/37] | English: | CONTROLLED POUR BOTTLE | [2019/37] | French: | BOUTEILLE À ÉCOULEMENT RÉGULÉ | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 08.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/08] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | LV | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LV | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | LV | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 13.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4928861 (SCHIEMANN WOLFRAM [DE]) [A] 1-15 * ) entire document *; | [A]US5346106 (RING CARL D [US]) [A] 1-15 * ) ontir9 document *; | [XY]US5538165 (FROHN WALTER [DE]) [X] 1, 2, 5-15 * ) entire document * [Y] 3, 4; | [A]US6360924 (FRANZEN BJOERN [SE]) [A] 1-15* ) entire document *; | [Y]US7959044 (CHRISTIAN ALLEN B [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4 * ) entire document * |