EP3532960 - SPILL RISK ASSESSMENT FOR LIQUID STORAGE FACILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | 26.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Pig Corporation One Pork Avenue Tipton, Pennsylvania 16684 / US | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMES, Andrew Ian 2306 Hickory Ridge Road Warriors Mark, Pennsylvania 16877 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 17863515.7 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58437 | Priority number, date | US201662412978P | 26.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662412978 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018081362 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532960 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61J3/00, B01F13/10, G06F17/40, G07F11/16, G01M3/00 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0635 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/06375 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P90/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | G06F19/00, A61J3/00, B01F13/10, G06F17/40, G07F11/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | AUSLAUFRISIKOBEURTEILUNG FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSAUFBEWAHRUNGSANLAGEN | [2019/36] | English: | SPILL RISK ASSESSMENT FOR LIQUID STORAGE FACILITIES | [2019/36] | French: | ÉVALUATION DE RISQUE DE DÉVERSEMENT POUR INSTALLATIONS DE STOCKAGE DE LIQUIDES | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 25.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | EP20181757.4 / EP3733149 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004168086 (YOUNG CARL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 3b, 4 *; | [I]WO2015181375 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [I] 1-15* figures 1,2 * | International search | [XY]US5724255 (SMITH VERNE E [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4-16, 18 * entire document * [Y] 3, 17, 19, 20; | [A]US2007244645 (HARA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2009015400 (BREED DAVID S [US]) [Y] 3, 17, 19, 20 * entire document *; | [A]US2011022532 (KRISS RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9043019 (ELIUK WALTER W [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [PA]US2016371618 (LEIDNER JOCHEN L [GB], et al) [PA] 1-20* entire document * |