EP3531832 - STORAGE MEDIA AND POWDER FORMULATIONS FOR AVULSED TEETH AND EXPLANTED TISSUES COMPRISING FIBROBLASTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marquette University PO Box 1881 Milwaukee, WI 53201 / US | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYEBI, Lobat 2525 South Shore Drive Unit 18D Milwaukee, WI 53207 / US | 02 /
RASOULIANBOROUJENI, Morteza 525 North 20th Street Milwaukee, WI 53233 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17863887.0 | 25.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58205 | Priority number, date | US201662412442P | 25.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662412442 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018081213 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531832 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
A01N1/0226 (EP,US);
A01N1/021 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PULVERFORMULIERUNGEN FÜR AVULSIERTE ZÄHNE UND EXPLANTIERTES GEWEBE MIT FIBROBLASTEN | [2019/36] | English: | STORAGE MEDIA AND POWDER FORMULATIONS FOR AVULSED TEETH AND EXPLANTED TISSUES COMPRISING FIBROBLASTS | [2019/36] | French: | SUPPORTS ET FORMULATIONS PULVÉRULENTES POUR DENTS AVULSÉES ET TISSUS EXPLANTÉS COMPRENANT DES FIBROBLASTES | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 01.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.07.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]KR20150069469 (NAT UNIV GYEONGSANG IACF [KR]); | [XPI]CN106417254 (GUANGZHOU SALIAI STEMCELL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [IP]WO2017123465 (DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC [US]); | International search | [Y]US2003198602 (CHEN BAO-LU [US], et al); | [Y]US2011036746 (BEAR JOHNNY R [US]); | [Y]CN103843758 (LIVESTOCK RES INST ANIMAL SCIENCE ACADEMY OF XINJIANG UYGUR AUTONOMOUS REGION); | [Y]CN105266916 (WANG JUNYAN); | [XY]EA201691066 ; | by applicant | KR20150069469 | CN106417254 | WO2017123465 |