EP3532778 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VACUUM COOLING A BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company Patents One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [2023/19] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company One Coca-Cola Plaza N.W. Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROEKENS, Jurgen Jagerslaan 14 1910 Kampenhout / BE | 02 /
DESSING, Jacobus, P. M. Kruisweg 1121 2131 CV Hoofddorp / NL | 03 /
IZENSON, Michael, Gary 641 Hanover Center Road Hanover, New Hampshire 03755 / US | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17864109.8 | 25.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58259 | Priority number, date | US201662413665P | 27.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662413665 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018081249 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532778 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3532778 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F25B27/00, F25B17/08, F25D31/00 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
F25D31/00 (EP,US);
F25D31/002 (CN);
F25B17/08 (CN);
F25B27/007 (EP);
F25B49/04 (CN);
F25D23/00 (CN);
F25D31/005 (CN);
F25D31/007 (EP,US);
F25D2331/805 (US);
Y02A30/27 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | F25B27/00, F25B17/08, F25B49/04, F25D31/00, F25D23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM VAKUUMKÜHLEN EINES GETRÄNKS | [2019/36] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VACUUM COOLING A BEVERAGE | [2019/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE REFROIDISSEMENT SOUS VIDE D'UNE BOISSON | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 24.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | LU | 25.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR802813 (M.E. PIQUEREZ) [A] 1* figures 1-5 *; | [XA]EP0543214 (ZEOLITH TECH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-5 * [A] 3-15; | [A]EP0577869 (ZEOLITH TECH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2005061022 (MAIER-LAXHUBER PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013291574 (ATHALYE ANISH [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH074776 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-25* See paragraphs [0001]-[0036] and figure 1. *; | [X]US2005061022 (MAIER-LAXHUBER PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0037], [0049]-[0060] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2011283735 (DAWOUD BELAL [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0018] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2013291574 (ATHALYE ANISH [US]) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0028] and figure 5A. *; | [A]US2014290293 (ECKHOFF PHILIP A [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0005]-[0023]. * | by applicant | EP0543214 | US2005061022 | WO2015116903 |