EP3533798 - DIBENZOPYRROMETHENE BORON CHELATE COMPOUND, NEAR INFRARED LIGHT ABSORBING MATERIAL, THIN FILM, AND ORGANIC ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUCHI, Toshifumi c/o Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 02 /
AOTAKE, Tatsuya c/o Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 03 /
YAKUSHIJI, Hidenori c/o Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 04 /
ABE, Masahiro c/o Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 05 /
SHINAMURA, Shoji c/o Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 06 /
SADAMITSU, Yuichi c/o Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | [2021/46] |
Former [2019/36] | 01 /
INOUCHI, Toshifumi c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
AOTAKE, Tatsuya c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
YAKUSHIJI, Hidenori c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
ABE, Masahiro c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
SHINAMURA, Shoji c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
SADAMITSU, Yuichi c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Innovation Creation R&D Center 31-12 Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wohlfahrt, Jan Günther, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17864154.4 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017JP38702 | Priority number, date | JP20160211280 | 28.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016211280 | JP20170089780 | 28.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017089780 | [2019/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018079653 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533798 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3533798 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, C09B23/00, C09K3/00, C09K11/06, H01L51/42, H01L51/50 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
C07F5/022 (EP,KR,US);
C07F5/02 (US);
C09B23/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09K3/00 (EP,US);
H10K30/00 (US);
H10K85/322 (EP,KR);
H10K85/60 (US);
C09K2211/188 (KR);
H10K30/50 (EP,KR);
H10K50/00 (US);
H10K50/10 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIBENZOPYRROMETHENBORCHELATVERBINDUNG, NAHINFRAROTLICHTABSORBIERENDES MATERIAL, DÜNNSCHICHT UND ORGANISCHE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/36] | English: | DIBENZOPYRROMETHENE BORON CHELATE COMPOUND, NEAR INFRARED LIGHT ABSORBING MATERIAL, THIN FILM, AND ORGANIC ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2019/36] | French: | COMPOSÉ CHÉLATE DE BORE DE DIBENZOPYRROMÉTHÈNE, MATÉRIAU ABSORBANT LA LUMIÈRE PROCHE INFRAROUGE, FILM MINCE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2019 | Translation filed | 28.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2017 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | IT | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 26.10.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 26.10.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.10.2017 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2012199541 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]WO2013035303 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2014065685 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [A]JP2014077042 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [A]JP2016006033 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2016166284 (UNIV TOKYO METROPOLITAN, et al) |