EP3533819 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AROMATIC POLYSULFONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Ltd. 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO Kazuyuki c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 6 Kitahara Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-3294 / JP | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17864697.2 | 24.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017JP38307 | Priority number, date | JP20160209245 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016209245 | [2019/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018079531 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533819 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/40, C08G75/20 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
C08G75/23 (EP,CN,KR);
C08G75/20 (EP,US);
C08G65/40 (EP,US);
C08G65/4056 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/34 (US);
C08K3/40 (US);
C08K7/06 (US);
C08K7/10 (US);
C08K7/14 (US);
C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L81/06 (EP,CN,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L81/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AROMATISCHEM POLYSULFON | [2019/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AROMATIC POLYSULFONE | [2019/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYSULFONE AROMATIQUE | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2019 | Translation filed | 18.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8604905 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [X]US4785072 (HARRIS JAMES E [US], et al); | [X]JPH0216122 (DAICEL CHEM); | [X]JPH05163352 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [X]EP2189487 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X]US2013109831 (LUTZ ERIC LEE [US], et al); | [X]US2015126635 (LIEDLOFF HANNS-JÖRG [CH], et al) | International search | [A]JPS62502406 ; | [A]JPH0216122 (DAICEL CHEM); | [A]JPH04359021 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2012509375 ; | [PA]WO2017099080 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |