EP3534156 - PORTABLE MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE FOR DETECTING NITRITE-NITRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad del Pais Vasco - Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea (UPV/EHU) Barrio Sarriena, S/N 48940 Leioa / ES | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENITO LÓPEZ, Fernando Barrio Sarriena, S/N 48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | 02 /
SAEZ CASTAÑO, Janire Barrio Sarriena, S/N 48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 17864999.2 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017ES70719 | Priority number, date | ES20160031376 | 26.10.2016 Original published format: ES 201631376 | [2019/36] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018078208 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | ES | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534156 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/22, G01N33/18, C08L33/26 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/18 (EP,ES,US);
G01N31/22 (ES,US);
G01N33/182 (EP,US);
B01L3/502707 (US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
C08F220/56 (EP);
C08L33/26 (EP,ES,US);
G01N31/227 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (US);
B01L2200/148 (US);
B01L2200/16 (US);
B01L2300/0809 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/56, C08F222/385 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHWEIS VON NITRIT-NITRAT | [2019/36] | English: | PORTABLE MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE FOR DETECTING NITRITE-NITRATE | [2019/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE PORTATIF CONÇU POUR DÉTECTER DU NITRITE-NITRATE | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2019 | Translation filed | 25.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 07.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]ES2185462 (UNIV GRANADA [ES]) [A] 1-21* , Page 5, lines 27-37. *; | [XP] - SAEZ, J. et al., "Ionogel-based Nitrite and Nitrate Sensor for Water Control at the Point-of-need", Procedia Engineering, vol. 168, (20160000), pages 518 - 521, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S1877705816338358, (20181202), XP029874995 [XP] 1-21 * See pages 519-520. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2016.11.513 | [A] - CZUGALA, M. et al., "Portable integrated microfluidic analytical platform for the monitoring and detection of nitrite", Talanta, (20130000), vol. 116, pages 997 - 1004, XP028743965 [A] 1-21 * . See page 999; figures 1, 4 and 5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2013.07.058 | [A] - HAIJUAN ZHANG et al., "A sensitive colorimetric method for the determination of nitrite in water supplies, meat and dairy products using ionic liquid-modified methyl red as a colour reagent", Food Chemistry, (20140000), vol. 151, pages 429 - 434, XP028668455 [A] 1-21 * . See page 430 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2013.11.016 | [A] - PETR KUBERSK et al., "An electrochemical NO 2 sensor based on ionic liquid: influence of the morphology of the polymer electrolyte on sensor sensitivity", Sensors, (20151111), vol. 15, no. 11, pages 28421 - 28434, XP055516154 [A] 1-21 * . See abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s151128421 |