EP3533062 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SYNTHETIC INTERACTION WITH USER AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedRespond, Inc. 2425 Sidney Street Pittsburgh, PA 15203 / US | [2023/19] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Pribanic, Virginia Flavin 209 Narragansett Drive McKeesport, PA 15135 / US | ||
For all designated states Hauptmann, Alexander 339 Stone Church Road Finleyville, PA 15332 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIBANIC, Vriginia, Flavin McKeesport, PA 15135 / US | 02 /
HAUPTMANN, Alexander Finleyville, PA 15332 / US | [2023/19] |
Former [2019/36] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | Cope, Alexander Charles Edgerton Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17865160.0 | 26.10.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US58627 | Priority number, date | US201662413112P | 26.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662413112 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018081485 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3533062 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/60 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
G16H10/20 (EP,US);
G06F40/40 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06N5/046 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H20/10 (US);
G16H20/30 (US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHETISCHEN INTERAKTION MIT EINEM BENUTZER UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/36] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SYNTHETIC INTERACTION WITH USER AND DEVICES | [2019/36] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INTERACTION SYNTHÉTIQUE ENTRE UN UTILISATEUR ET DES DISPOSITIFS | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010179833 (ROIZEN MICHAEL F [US], et al) [I] 1-18* paragraphs [0034] , [0039] , [0046] , [0058] , [0069] , [0071] , [0086]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2014257836 (WALKER CLINTON COLIN GRAHAM [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0047] , [0051] , [0052] , [0054] , [0055]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0058] , [0062] , [0064] , [0065] , [0068] , [0070] , [0072] * * paragraphs [0076] , [0077] , [0101] * | International search | [Y]US2006085225 (GOLD LIANA [US]) [Y] 1, 3-6, 8-13, 16-18* ; paragraphs [0022], [0029]-[0031], [0036]-[0038], [0041] *; | [YA]US2006200007 (BROCKWAY MARINA [US], et al) [Y] 1, 3-6, 8-13, 16-18 * ; paragraphs [0018], [0021], [0030], [0036], [0050], [0064], [0065], [0077], [0078], claims 1, 7 * [A] 2, 7, 14, 15; | [YA]US7149756 (SCHMITT ARMAND J [US], et al) [Y] 1, 3-6, 8-13, 16-18 * ; abstract, figures 3, 7, 8, 10, column 3, lines 3-58, column 5, lines 2-7, 18-23, lines 18-55, column 7, lines 20-46, column 11, lines 44-55, claims 1, 5 * [A] 2, 7, 14, 15 | by applicant | US5870755 |