EP3535067 - ULTRASONIC LENS CLEANING SYSTEM WITH IMPEDANCE MONITORING TO DETECT FAULTS OR DEGRADATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGEE, David, Patrick 1108 Krum Court Allen TX 75013 / US | 02 /
FEDIGAN, Stephen, John 8416 Hillendale Dr. Plano TX 75025 / US | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17866470.2 | 01.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017US59536 | Priority number, date | US201662415554P | 01.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662415554 P | US201715497624 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: US201715497624 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018085403 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3535067 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00, B08B7/02, G03B29/00, H01L41/04, G02B27/00, B06B1/02 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B08B7/028 (EP,US);
B06B1/0284 (EP,US);
G01H1/00 (EP,US);
G02B27/0006 (EP,US);
H10N30/802 (EP,US);
B60S1/56 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | B08B7/02, G03B29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ULTRASCHALLREINIGEN VON LINSEN MIT IMPEDANZÜBERWACHUNG ZUR DETEKTION VON FEHLERN ODER BESCHÄDIGUNG | [2019/37] | English: | ULTRASONIC LENS CLEANING SYSTEM WITH IMPEDANCE MONITORING TO DETECT FAULTS OR DEGRADATION | [2019/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NETTOYAGE DE LENTILLE À ULTRASONS AVEC SURVEILLANCE D'IMPÉDANCE POUR DÉTECTER DES DÉFAUTS OU UNE DÉGRADATION | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008198458 (KASHIYAMA RITSUO [JP]); | [A]EP2479595 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US9070856 (ROSE EMERY [US], et al); | [XI]US2016266379 (LI YUNHONG [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5178173 (ERICKSON JOHN J [US], et al); | [Y]US6064259 (TAKITA MARK K [US]); | [Y]EP2777579 (COVIDIEN LP [US]); | [YA]US2016266379 (LI YUNHONG [US], et al) | by applicant | US2016266379 |