EP3537427 - DRINKING CONTAINER USED FOR TOAST AND DRINKING CONTAINER SERVING AS BELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koizumi Factory 1-14 Otemachi Takaoka-shi, Toyama 933-0039 / JP | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIZUMI, Toshihiro c/o Koizumi Factory Corporation 57-5 Toidesakaemachi Takaoka-shi, Toyama 939-1118 / JP | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte PartG mbB Irmgardstraße 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Wunderlich & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17867671.4 | 31.10.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017JP39239 | Priority number, date | JP20160214635 | 01.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016214635 | JP20170025491 | 15.02.2017 Original published format: JP 2017025491 | [2019/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018084127 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537427 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10K1/072, A47G19/22, G01H3/00, G01N33/14, G10K1/07, G10K1/10 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A47G19/2227 (EP,US);
A47G19/22 (US);
B65D85/72 (US);
G10K1/00 (US);
G10K1/06 (US);
G10K1/07 (EP,US);
G10K1/072 (US);
G10K1/10 (EP);
A47G2019/2244 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | G10K1/072, A47G19/22, G01H3/00, G01N33/14 | ||
Former IPC [2019/37] | G10K1/072, A47G19/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | TRINKBEHÄLTER ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR TRINKSPRÜCHE UND TRINKBEHÄLTER ALS GLOCKE | [2019/37] | English: | DRINKING CONTAINER USED FOR TOAST AND DRINKING CONTAINER SERVING AS BELL | [2019/37] | French: | RÉCIPIENT POUR BOIRE UTILISÉ POUR PORTER UN TOAST ET RÉCIPIENT POUR BOIRE SERVANT DE CLOCHE | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2019 | Translation filed | 27.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 30.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/28] | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB250887 (EMIL MARX) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS56125779U (UNKNOWN) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE8301382U (RASTAL GMBH & CO. KG) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020]; figure - *; | [X]JPH0286368U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH0298755U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9735503 (PD CONGRATULATION KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0033]; figure - *; | [X]TW201338728 (UNIV SOUTHERN TAIWAN [TW]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0025]; figure - *; | [XI] - Anonymous, "Pinterest: Vintage Brass Shot Glass Bell on Bottom", (20160912), URL: https://nl.pinterest.com/pin/417779302917195719/, (20200428), XP055689640 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [I] 7,8 | International search | [A]JPS5230276U (HARIOGLASS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS59106480U (MARUICO., LTD.) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS59125276U (YOSHIDA, Shunji) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH06292626 (OCHIAI YASUYOSHI) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US2006207410 (KIM YONG-SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US2009270011 (NOVAK FRANK [US]) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]CN104545237 (YANG SHIYU) [A] 1-8* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS4952875U | JP2013533174 |