EP3535870 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR BEAM MANAGEMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Namjeong 246-804 16 Bongyeong-ro 1744beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16711 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Taeyoung 10-1103 321 Apgujeong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06007 / KR | 03 /
RYU, Hyunseok 501-1103 37 Heungdeok 1-ro 79beon-gil Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16953 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jeongho 106-1003 13-10 Seocho-daero 65-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06602 / KR | 05 /
SON, Hyukmin 6408-1502 215 Wiryejungang-ro Hanam-si Gyeonggi-do 13014 / KR | 06 /
XUE, Peng 3008-1101 134 Beopjo-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16512 / KR | 07 /
YU, Hyunkyu 2304-1201 23 Gwanggyohosu-ro 152beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16513 / KR | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17867854.6 | 03.11.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017KR12371 | Priority number, date | KR20160146677 | 04.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160146677 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018084616 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3535870 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3535870 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/0413, H04B7/08 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/06952 (KR);
H04B7/0413 (CN,KR);
H04B7/0617 (CN,US);
H04B17/328 (KR);
H04B7/0408 (KR);
H04B7/0456 (CN,US);
H04B7/0619 (CN);
H04B7/0626 (CN,US);
H04B7/0628 (KR);
H04B7/063 (EP,CN);
H04B7/088 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L5/005 (KR);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/231 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | H04B7/06, H04B7/0413 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STRAHLVERWALTUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2019/37] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR BEAM MANAGEMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2019/37] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE FAISCEAU DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 06.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2023 | 19.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24153216.7 / EP4333322 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3501227 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [Y]US2015289249 (NOH MIN SEOK [KR], et al); | [XY]US2016134352 (STIRLING-GALLACHER RICHARD [US]); | [A]US2016301505 (FURUSKOG JOHAN [SE], et al); | Examination | US2014128109 | by applicant | EP3501227 |