EP3537878 - ALGICIDAL ORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pro Farm Group, Inc. 1530 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | [2023/46] |
Former [2023/42] | For all designated states Pro Farm Group, Inc. 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | ||
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. 7780-420 Brier Creek Parkway Raleigh, NC 27617-7882 / US | ||
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Marrone Bio Innovations, Inc. 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALIN, John 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | 02 /
CORDOVA-KREYLOS, Ana, Lucia 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | 03 /
MARRONE, Pamela 1540 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95618 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 17868136.7 | 18.05.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017US33309 | Priority number, date | US201662416796P | 03.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662416796 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018084895 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537878 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3537878 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/12, A01N25/14, A01N25/02, A01N25/04, A01N25/06, A01N25/18, C09D5/16, A01N63/22, A01N63/25, A01N63/28, A01N63/00, A01P13/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
C09D5/1687 (EP,US);
A01N63/20 (EP,US);
A01N63/22 (EP,US);
A01N63/23 (US);
A01N63/25 (EP,US);
A01N63/28 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N63/30, A01N63/22, A01N63/23, A01N63/20, A01N63/27, A01N63/28, A01N63/38, A01N63/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/38] | A01N63/02, A01N25/12, A01N25/14, A01N25/02, A01N25/04, A01N25/06, A01N25/18, C09D5/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALGIZIDE ORGANISMEN | [2019/38] | English: | ALGICIDAL ORGANISMS | [2019/38] | French: | ORGANISMES ALGICIDES | [2019/38] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 06.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014221207 (ASOLKAR RATNAKAR [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0005] - [0030] - [ 135] - [0137] - [ 194] , [ 205] * | International search | [X]KR19980065146 (KOREA GINSENG & TOBACCO RESEARCH INSTITUTE) [X] 1-16 * See claims 1-4; examples 3-4. *; | [X]KR100468053B (HANYANG HAK WON CO., LTD.) [X] 1-16 * See claims 1-2. *; | [X]WO2008124675 (NOVOZYMES BIOLOGICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * See examples 1-3. *; | [A]WO2016039961 (MARRONE BIO INNOVATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-16* See example 10. *; | [X] - ZHANG, B. et al., "Streptomyces alboflavus RPS and its novel and high algicidal activity against harmful algal bloom species Phaeocystis globosa", Plos One, (20140327), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 1 - 10, XP055481335 [X] 1-16 * See abstract; page 2, right column, third paragraph; page 3, right column, second paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0092907 | by applicant | US6194194 | US2014221207 |