EP3534861 - ADAPTIVE SHADOW CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SURGICAL LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Sterilizer Company 5960 Heisley Road Mentor, OH 44060-1834 / US | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLOPETER, Michael 7190 Giuliano Drive Kirtland, OH 44094 / US | 02 /
JESURUN, David 1196 Dorsh Road South Eiclid, OH 44121 / US | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 17868141.7 | 26.07.2017 | [2019/37] | WO2017US43880 | Priority number, date | US201662415595P | 01.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662415595 P | US201715642379 | 06.07.2017 Original published format: US201715642379 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018084905 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3534861 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3534861 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/00, F21V1/00, G01B9/08, G01S3/786, G09G3/32 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H05B45/12 (EP,US);
A61B90/30 (EP,US);
H05B45/00 (EP,US);
H05B47/115 (EP);
H05B47/155 (EP);
H05B47/17 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES SCHATTENSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN CHIRURGISCHES BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/37] | English: | ADAPTIVE SHADOW CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SURGICAL LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2019/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'OMBRE ADAPTATIVE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE CHIRURGICAL | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 29.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24183949.7 / EP4411709 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2003185009 (WALTERS MARK WAYNE [US]); | [XA]WO2013088312 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [XA]US2014066722 (MARKA RUDOLF [DE], et al) | International search | [Y]US6513962 (MAYSHACK ALVIN C [US], et al); | [XY]US2003185009 (WALTERS MARK WAYNE [US]); | [Y]US2004155844 (STOPA JAMES L [US]); | [A]US2014268855 (GERARDO TONY [US]) | by applicant | US2003185009 | WO2013088312 | US2014066722 |