EP3522617 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSION POWER OF USER EQUIPMENT IN BEAMFORMING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Hyunseok 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Namjeong 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Jeongho 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
SEOL, Jiyun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SON, Hyukmin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
XUE, Peng 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
YU, Hyunkyu 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/32] | Application number, filing date | 17868254.8 | 03.11.2017 | [2019/32] | WO2017KR12394 | Priority number, date | KR20160146079 | 03.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160146079 | KR20170002569 | 06.01.2017 Original published format: KR 20170002569 | KR20170015105 | 02.02.2017 Original published format: KR 20170015105 | KR20170075747 | 15.06.2017 Original published format: KR 20170075747 | [2019/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018084626 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3522617 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/14, H04W52/24, H04W16/28, H04W52/38, H04L5/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/14 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/243 (KR);
H04W52/38 (EP,US);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | H04W52/14, H04W52/24, H04W16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER SENDELEISTUNG EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS IN EINEM STRAHLFORMUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/32] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSION POWER OF USER EQUIPMENT IN BEAMFORMING SYSTEM | [2019/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION DE LA PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR DANS UN SYSTÈME À CONFORMATION DE FAISCEAU | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2019 | Translation filed | 03.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 30.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 26.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2276302 (DA TANG MOBILE COMM EQUIPMENT [CN]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] *; | [XI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "PUSCH in UpPTS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609991 PUSCH IN UPPTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051150016 [X] 1,4,5,8,9,12,13 * section 2.1 * [I] 2,3,6,7,10,11,14,15 | [I] - CATT, "Remaining issues for PUSCH support in UpPTS", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1608740, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051148796 [I] 1-15 * section 2, point "DMRS for PUSCH in UpPTS" * * section 2, point "TBS determination for PUSCH in UpPTS" * | [I] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Principles for Reference Signal Design and QCL Assumptions for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-167224, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051140589 [I] 1-15 * section 3.3 * * section 3.4 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "On UL RS for CSI measurements", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161009), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609764 ON UL RS FOR CSI MEASUREMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161009), XP051149794 [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 5 * | International search | [A]US9414332 (DINAN ESMAEL HEJAZI [US]) [A] 1-15 * See column 3, lines 1-27; column 12, lines 34-64; and claim 1. *; | [A]KR20140126346 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0052]-[0054]; and claim 19. *; | [A]WO2016146010 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0057], [0064]-[0070]; and claims 1, 8. *; | [A]KR20160062731 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0175]-[0178]; and claims 5-7. *; | [A]WO2016072052 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0051]; claims 1-5; and figure 1. * |