EP3428794 - METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR LOADING MEDIA RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Huihai Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Dapeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YING, Yunjian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Qiulin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP MTH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 17868406.4 | 13.04.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017CN80476 | Priority number, date | CN201610942691 | 01.11.2016 Original published format: CN201610942691 | [2019/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018082255 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428794 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F3/0482 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F1/3206 (EP);
G06F1/3234 (EP);
G06F16/00 (US);
G06F16/957 (CN);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06F9/44 (US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/03] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄT ZUM LADEN EINER MEDIENRESSOURCE | [2019/03] | English: | METHOD AND TERMINAL FOR LOADING MEDIA RESOURCE | [2019/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET TERMINAL DE CHARGEMENT DE RESSOURCE MULTIMÉDIA | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2018 | Translation filed | 11.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 13.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.02.2023 | 09.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 13.04.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008079972 (GOODWIN ROBERT L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2012086650 (OIWA RYOTA [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0112] *; | [A] - "SCROLLING USING VIRTUAL SCROLL WHEEL WITH INERTIAL AND FRICTION", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20051222), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013112207 [A] 1-15 * page 2 - page 3 * | International search | [A]US2014055395 (KIM KWANG-JU [KR]) [A] 1-21* , entire document *; | [A]CN105095200 (UNIV PEKING FOUNDER GROUP CO, et al) [A] 1-21 * , description, paragraphs [0058]-[0096] *; | [A]CN105426073 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * , entire document *; | [A]CN105760067 (GUANGZHOU UCWEB COMPUTER TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * , entire document * |