|
19.06.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
20.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
17.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
22 |