02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
20.06.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
07.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
14.07.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.04.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
15.02.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.04.2021 |
First examination report |
|
15.04.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
17.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
17.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
10.01.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
10.01.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
28.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
16.08.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
22.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|