EP3538266 - LITHIUM EXTRACTION WITH COATED ION EXCHANGE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lilac Solutions, Inc. 1700 20th Street Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2024/13] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Lilac Solutions, Inc. 9 Sakonnet Terrace Middletown, Rhode Island 02842 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNYDACKER, David Henry 1266 9th Avenue 103 San Francisco California 94122 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/34] |
Former [2019/38] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds West Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17869271.1 | 13.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017US61384 | Priority number, date | US201662421934P | 14.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662421934 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018089932 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3538266 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3538266 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J39/10, C22B26/12, H01M10/54, B01D15/36, B01J39/02, B01J47/016, B01J47/018, C22B3/42 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B01D15/362 (EP,US);
B01J39/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01D15/361 (US);
B01J20/282 (US);
B01J39/02 (EP,US);
B01J47/016 (EP,US);
B01J47/018 (EP,US);
C22B26/12 (EP,KR,US);
C22B3/42 (EP,US);
H01M10/54 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP,KR);
Y02W30/84 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/38] | B01J39/10, C22B26/12, H01M10/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMEXTRAKTION MIT BESCHICHTETEN IONENAUSTAUSCHTEILCHEN | [2019/38] | English: | LITHIUM EXTRACTION WITH COATED ION EXCHANGE PARTICLES | [2019/38] | French: | EXTRACTION DE LITHIUM AVEC DES PARTICULES REVÊTUES D'ÉCHANGE D'IONS | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24194816.5 / EP4438749 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN105238927 (UNIV EAST CHINA SCIENCE & TECH); | International search | [X]US2011174739 (CHUNG KANG-SUP [KR], et al); | [X]US2014113197 (XIAO XINGCHENG [US], et al); | [X]CN103794779 (UNIV GUANGXI NORMAL); | [X]US2015083667 (STOUFFER MARK R [US]); | Examination | CN101764209 | by applicant | CN105238927 |