EP3538089 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING OROXYLIN A AND METHOD OF EXTRACTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sami-Sabinsa Group Limited 19/1 & 19/2 I Main, II Phase Peenya Industrial Area Bangalore, Karnataka 560058 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/32] | For all designated states Sami-Sabinsa Group Limited 19/1 & 19/2 I Main, II Phase Peenya Industrial Area Karnataka, Bangalore 560058 / IN | ||
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Sami Labs Limited 19/1 & 19/2, I Main, II Phase Peenya Industrial Area Bangalore 560058 KRN / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAJEED, Muhammed Sabinsa Corporation 20 Lake Drive East Windsor NJ 08520 / US | 02 /
NAGABHUSHANAM, Kalyanam Sabinsa Corporation 20 Lake Drive East Windsor NJ 08520 / US | 03 /
BHAT, Beena Sami Labs Limited 19/1 & 19/2, I Main, II Phase Peenya Industrial Area Bangalore 560058 Karnataka / IN | 04 /
PANDE, Anurag Sabinsa Corporation 20 Lake Drive East Windsor NJ 08520 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 17869781.9 | 07.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017US60290 | Priority number, date | US201662420676P | 11.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662420676 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018089325 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3538089 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/185, A61K31/353, A61K31/7048, A61K31/352 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2236/00 (EP,US);
A61K2236/15 (US);
A61K2236/17 (US);
A61K2236/333 (KR,US);
A61K2236/51 (KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2020/32] | A61K36/185, A61K31/353, A61K31/7048 | ||
Former IPC [2019/38] | A61K31/353, A61K31/7048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT OROXYLIN A UND VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKTION DAVON | [2019/38] | English: | COMPOSITION CONTAINING OROXYLIN A AND METHOD OF EXTRACTION THEREOF | [2019/38] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DE L'OROXYLINE A ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION | [2019/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007096739 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN], et al) [X] 4,5 * example -; claim - * [I] 1-7; | [I] - REN-YI YAN ET AL, "Antioxidant flavonoids from the seed of", FITOTERAPIA, IDB HOLDING, MILAN, IT, vol. 82, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.FITOTE.2011.04.006, ISSN 0367-326X, (20110423), pages 841 - 848, (20110509), XP028097966 [I] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fitote.2011.04.006 | International search | [A]US2004092458 (JIA QI [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * ENTIRE DOCUMENT *; | [A]US2005008710 (SUBBIAH VEN [US]) [A] 1-7* ENTIRE DOCUMENT *; | [XY]US2006204596 (JIA QI [US], et al) [X] 6-7 * para [0043];[0054]-[0056];[0078];[0109];[0110]; [0118]; [0119];[0122];[0123]; [0135], table 2 * [Y] 1-3; | [XY]US2011059913 (RAO JANASWAMY MADUSUDANA [IN], et al) [X] 4-5 * para [0017];[0018];[0020]-[0022];[0025];[0026];[0044];[0062];[0077]; * [Y] 1-3 |