EP3538830 - COOLING PANEL COUPLED TO AN INNER WALL OF A STEEL MAKING FURNACE AND ASSOCIATED STEEL MAKING FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/38] | EXTENDED LEG RETURN ELBOW FOR USE WITH A STEEL MAKING FURNACE AND METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2021/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amerifab, Inc. 3501 East 9th Street Indianapolis, IN 46201 / US | [2019/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANASEK, Richard J. 13232 West Road Carmel IN 46032 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2019/38] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17870445.8 | 10.11.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017US61027 | Priority number, date | US201662419995P | 10.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662419995 P | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018089749 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3538830 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3538830 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F27D9/00, F27B1/24, F27B3/24, F27D1/12, // F27D1/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
F27D1/12 (EP,US);
F16L43/001 (US);
F27B1/24 (EP);
F27B3/24 (EP);
F27D9/00 (EP);
F27D2001/0059 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/14] | F27D9/00, F27D17/00, F27B3/26, F27B1/24, F27B3/24, F27D1/12, F27D1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/38] | F27D9/00, F27D17/00, F27B3/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLPLATTE, DIE AN EINER INNENWAND EINES STAHLWERKSOFENS UND EINES ZUGEHÖRIGEN STAHLWERKSOFENS DAFÜR | [2021/23] | English: | COOLING PANEL COUPLED TO AN INNER WALL OF A STEEL MAKING FURNACE AND ASSOCIATED STEEL MAKING FURNACE | [2021/23] | French: | PANNEAU DE REFROIDISSEMENT ACCROCHÉ AU MUR INTERNE D'UN FOUR DE FABRICATION D'ACIER ET FOUR DE FABRICATION D'ACIER ASSOCIÉ | [2021/23] |
Former [2019/38] | RÜCKFLUSSBOGEN MIT ERWEITERTEM BEIN ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM STAHLERZEUGUNGSOFEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2019/38] | EXTENDED LEG RETURN ELBOW FOR USE WITH A STEEL MAKING FURNACE AND METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2019/38] | COUDE DE RENVOI À EXTRÉMITÉ PLUS LONGUE QUE L'AUTRE DESTINÉ À UN FOUR DE FABRICATION D'ACIER ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 14.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2017 | AL | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | MT | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | IE | 10.11.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 10.11.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.11.2017 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
IE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 27.10.2021 | |
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 27.10.2021 | |
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 27.10.2021 | |
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | FI | 27.10.2021 | |
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 27.10.2021 | |
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 27.10.2021 | |
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]SE335997 (VSESOJUZ NI PROEK INST OCHISTK [SU]) [X] 1-4,9 * figure 2 * * pages 6, 8 * [I] 5-8,10-15; | [XI]US4637034 (GRAGEDA IGNACIO J [MX]) [X] 1-4,9,11-15 * figures 4, 6, 8 * * claim 7 * * column 6, line 17 - line 33 * [I] 5-10; | [A]US6041854 (FOX PETER [GB]) [A] 5,10-12 * figures 3b, 4b, 5b, 6b ** claims 2, 4 *; | [XI]US2006285572 (LOEBNER ANDREAS [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 14] * [I] 5-8,10-15 | International search | [A]US4453500 (KUHLMANN HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 5; and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]US5241979 (CHANG FRANK [TW]) [Y] 1-20 * See column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 14; claims 1-4; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US5740196 (JOHNSON ERIC N [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 20; and figures 1-6. *; | [A]WO03002769 (FAIRMONT ELECTRONICS COMPANY L [GB], et al) [A] 1-20* See page 5, line 14 - page 8, line 3; and figures 1-7. *; | [Y]US2008296006 (MANASEK RICHARD J [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0095]; and figures 1, Id, 5-8. * |