Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019368880 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN95038 | 28.07.2017 | CN201611049020 | 21.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3543653 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2023 | B1 | EP3543653 | 29.07.2020 | A4 | EP3543653 | 25.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN95038 | 28.07.2017 | CN201611049020 | 21.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018090667 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201611049020 | 21.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106802151B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2020 | B | CN106802151 | 06.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201611049020 | 21.11.2016 |