EP3541826 - METHODS FOR DETECTING DNA MUTATIONS USING MITRA TIP EXTRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quest Diagnostics Investments LLC 500 Plaza Drive Secaucus, NJ 07094 / US | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDERS, Heather 33608 Ortega Highway San Juan Capistrano, California 92675 / US | 02 /
CLARKE, Nigel J. 2029 Rancho Corte Vista, California 92084 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17871115.6 | 13.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017US61316 | Priority number, date | US201662422334P | 15.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662422334 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093724 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541826 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3541826 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, C07H21/04, C12N5/07, C12N5/10, C12N9/16 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12N15/1058 (US);
C12N15/1065 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
G01N33/4875 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
G01N33/533 (US);
C12Q2527/125 (US);
C12Q2600/112 (US);
C12Q2600/118 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2527/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON DNA-MUTATIONEN MITTELS MITRASPITZENEXTRAKTION | [2019/39] | English: | METHODS FOR DETECTING DNA MUTATIONS USING MITRA TIP EXTRACTION | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE MUTATIONS D'ADN À L'AIDE D'UNE EXTRACTION DE POINTE MITRA | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23199409.6 Application refused : 12.02.2024 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | MC | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | LU | 13.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013067520 (RUDGE JAMES [US], et al) [X] 13 * the whole document * [I] 1-14; | [XY]WO2016134324 (NEOTERYX LLC [US]) [X] 13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14; | [XY] - HARALD JOHN ET AL, "Procedures for Analysis of Dried Plasma Using Microsampling Devices to Detect Sulfur Mustard-Albumin Adducts for Verification of Poisoning", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20160815), vol. 88, no. 17, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.6b02199, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 8787 - 8794, XP055715053 [X] 13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.6b02199 | [XY] - LUO Y ET AL, "Evaluation of two blood microsampling approaches for drug discovery PK studies in rats", BIOANALYSIS 20150901 FUTURE SCIENCE LTD GBR, (20150901), vol. 7, no. 18, ISSN 1757-6180, pages 2345 - 2359, XP009521709 [X] 13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4155/bio.15.126 | [XY] - HOLLY NICHOLLS ET AL, "Evaluation of the Mitra(TM) Micro-sampling Device Against Dried Blood Spot Cards for Measurement of 25-hydroxy Vitamin D3 by LC-MS/MS", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (20160101), doi:10.13140/rg.2.2.20843.75043, XP055715146 [X] 13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13140/rg.2.2.20843.75043 | [XY] - NEIL SPOONER ET AL, "A device for dried blood microsampling in quantitative bioanalysis: overcoming the issues associated blood hematocrit", BIOANALYSIS, London, UK, (20150401), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.4155/bio.14.310, ISSN 1757-6180, pages 653 - 659, XP055493432 [X] 13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4155/bio.14.310 | [XI] - PHILIP DENNIFF ET AL, "Volumetric Absorptive Microsampling: A Dried Sample Collection Technique for Quantitative Bioanalysis", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20140819), vol. 86, no. 16, doi:10.1021/ac5022562, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 8489 - 8495, XP055263361 [X] 13 * the whole document * [I] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac5022562 | International search | [Y]US2011203688 (REED MICHAEL W [US], et al) [Y] 22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012192298 (WEINSTEIN EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 20-25 * entire document *; | [A]WO2016037142 (ZHENG ZHI [US]) [A] 1-3, 20-25, 27-29* entire document *; | [XY]US2016281166 (BHATTACHARJEE ARINDAM [US], et al) [X] 27-29 * entire document * [Y] 1-3, 20-25; | [PX]WO2017060271 (UNIV GENT [BE], et al) [PX] 1-3, 20-25, 27-29 * entire document *; | [PX]WO2017161201 (CYNVENIO BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1-3, 20-25, 27-29 * entire document *; | [Y] - HOUBART et al., "Volumetric Absorptive Microsampling for Hepcidin Peptide Extraction from Whole Blood", LCGC North America, (20160501), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 340 - 347, XP055486510 [Y] 23-25 * . entire document * |