EP3543238 - NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES HAVING ANTI-VIRAL ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/39] | NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVE HAVING PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING ANTI-VIRAL ACTIVITY | ||
[2021/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Center for Global Health and Medicine 1-21-1, Toyama Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8655 / JP | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUYA Hiroaki c/o National Center for Global Health and Medicine 1-21-1 Toyama Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8655 / JP | 02 /
KUMAMOTO Hiroki c/o National Center for Global Health and Medicine 1-21-1 Toyama Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8655 / JP | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2019/39] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17871309.5 | 13.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017JP40790 | Priority number, date | JP20160223511 | 16.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016223511 | [2019/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018092728 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543238 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543238 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/18, A61P31/12, A61P31/18, A61P31/20, A61K31/522, A61K45/06 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP,US);
A61P31/20 (EP,US);
C07D473/18 (EP);
C07D487/04 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | C07D487/04, A61K31/522, A61P31/12, A61P31/18, A61P31/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEOSIDDERIVATE MIT ANTIVIRALER AKTIVITÄT | [2021/07] | English: | NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES HAVING ANTI-VIRAL ACTIVITY | [2021/07] | French: | DÉRIVÉS NUCLÉOSIDIQUES AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ ANTIVIRALE | [2021/07] |
Former [2019/39] | NUKLEOSIDDERIVAT MIT PHYSISCHEN AKTIVITÄTEN MIT ANTIVIRALER AKTIVITÄT | ||
Former [2019/39] | NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVE HAVING PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING ANTI-VIRAL ACTIVITY | ||
Former [2019/39] | DÉRIVÉ NUCLÉOSIDIQUE AYANT DES ACTIVITÉS PHYSIQUES COMPRENANT UNE ACTIVITÉ ANTIVIRALE | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2019 | Translation filed | 24.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 07.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2017 | AL | 19.05.2021 | AT | 19.05.2021 | CY | 19.05.2021 | CZ | 19.05.2021 | DK | 19.05.2021 | EE | 19.05.2021 | ES | 19.05.2021 | FI | 19.05.2021 | HR | 19.05.2021 | LT | 19.05.2021 | LV | 19.05.2021 | MC | 19.05.2021 | MK | 19.05.2021 | MT | 19.05.2021 | NL | 19.05.2021 | PL | 19.05.2021 | RO | 19.05.2021 | RS | 19.05.2021 | SE | 19.05.2021 | SI | 19.05.2021 | SK | 19.05.2021 | SM | 19.05.2021 | BG | 19.08.2021 | NO | 19.08.2021 | GR | 20.08.2021 | IS | 19.09.2021 | PT | 20.09.2021 | LU | 13.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 13.11.2017 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
MK | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.11.2017 | |
AL | 19.05.2021 | ||
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CY | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
LU | 13.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
MC | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SI | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 19.05.2021 | |
AT | 19.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
EE | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RO | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SK | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
CZ | 19.05.2021 | ||
DK | 19.05.2021 | ||
ES | 19.05.2021 | ||
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
SM | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
NL | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
PL | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
RS | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
IS | 19.09.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
PT | 20.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
HR | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
LV | 19.05.2021 | ||
SE | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
NO | 19.08.2021 | ||
GR | 20.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | ||
BG | 19.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.05.2021 | |
FI | 19.05.2021 | ||
LT | 19.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2015077360 (IDENIX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [I] 1,3-15 * abstract * * page 45; compound 333/a/b/c * * page 47; compound 433/a/b/c * [A] 2; | [T] - HIGASHI-KUWATA, N. ET AL., "CMCdG, a Novel Nucleoside Analog with Favorable Safety Features, Exerts Potent Activity against Wild-Type and Entecavir-Resistant Hepatitis B Virus", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (20190327), vol. 63, no. 4, doi:10.1128/AAC.02143-18, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1 - 17, XP055667538 [T] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.02143-18 | International search | [Y]JPH04282373 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO) [Y] 1-4 * , & US 5206244 & EP 481754 A2 & KR 10-0160523 B & CN 1061972 A *; | [Y]JPH0680688 (ASAHI BREWERIES LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JP2011503234 [Y] 1-4 * , & WO 2009/067409 A1, & US 2009/0318380 A1 & EP 2227482 A1 & CN 101932590 A *; | [Y]JP2013510904 [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]WO2016134054 (ABBVIE INC [US]) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y] - Ohrui, Hiroshi, "Creation of low-toxic high-activity reverse transcriptase-inhibiting nucleosides that do not express resistant HIV. Could it be a magic bullet for AIDS and hepatitis B dreams?]", Kagaku to seibutsu, (20060000), vol. 44, no. 10, pages 660 - 662, XP009514931 [Y] 1-4 | [Y] - TAKAMATSU, Y. et al., "4′-modified nucleoside analogs: Potent inhibitors active against entecavir-resistant hepatitis B virus", HEPATOLOGY, (20150000), vol. 62, no. 4, doi:10.1002/hep.27962, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 1024 - 1036, XP055605356 [Y] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.27962 | [Y] - KODAMA, E., "4'-Ethynyl Nucleoside Analogs: Potent Inhibitors of Multidrug-Resistant Human Immunodeficiency Virus Variants In Vitro", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (20010000), vol. 45, no. 5, doi:10.1128/AAC.45.5.1539-1546.2001, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1539 - 1546, XP001127402 [Y] 1-4 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.45.5.1539-1546.2001 | [Y] - KUMAMOTO, H . et al., "Diastereoselective Synthesis of 6″-( Z )- and 6″-( E )-Fluoro Analogues of Anti-hepatitis B Virus Agent Entecavir and Its Evaluation of the Activity and Toxicity Profile of the Diastereomers", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, (20160324), vol. 81, no. 7, doi:10.1021/acs.joc.6b00105, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2827 - 2836, XP055605358 [Y] 1-4 * , * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.joc.6b00105 | by applicant | JP2001335592 | JP2001335593 | WO03068796 | JP2004107329 | JP2004244422 | WO2005090349 | JP2008273960 | - J. Org. Chem., (20040000), vol. 69, page 2634 | - J. Org. Chem., (20000000), vol. 65, page 7697 |