EP3543312 - HEAT TRANSFER MEDIUM MELTING COMPOSITION, HEAT TRANSFER SYSTEM USING SAME, AND POWER GENERATION DEVICE USING HEAT TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Machinery & Materials 156 Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34103 / KR | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young 206-504 147 Baeul 1-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34033 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jun-seok 206-1603 60 Jijokbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34070 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dong-ho 201 87 Sinseongnam-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34116 / KR | 04 /
YOON, Seok-ho 105-502 160 Dunsanbuk-ro Seo-gu Daejeon 35247 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Ook-joong 205-1902 10 Hakhanam-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34209 / KR | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Gaunt, Thomas Derrick Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Gaunt, Thomas Derrick Lewis Silkin LLP 5 Chancery Lane Clifford's Inn London EC4A 1BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17871327.7 | 09.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017KR12638 | Priority number, date | KR20160154773 | 21.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160154773 | KR20170057030 | 04.05.2017 Original published format: KR 20170057030 | [2019/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093091 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543312 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3543312 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/12, F28D20/00 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C09K5/12 (EP,KR);
F28D20/00 (EP);
F28D20/0034 (KR);
F28D2020/0047 (KR);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSMEDIUM SCHMELZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM DAMIT UND STROMERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMS | [2019/39] | English: | HEAT TRANSFER MEDIUM MELTING COMPOSITION, HEAT TRANSFER SYSTEM USING SAME, AND POWER GENERATION DEVICE USING HEAT TRANSFER SYSTEM | [2019/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DE FUSION DE MILIEU DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE, SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE L'UTILISANT, ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE UTILISANT LE SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2019 | Translation filed | 18.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 11.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 25.01.2023 | |
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 25.01.2023 | |
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3719225 (MEKJEAN M, et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2011120673 (XIANG XIAODONG [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5894282B (CORNING INC.) [A] 1-11 * See claims 1-5. *; | [A]KR960001084B (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [A] 1-11* See claims 1-6. *; | [A]JPH11325769 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-11 * See claims 1-8. *; | [A]JP2016188347 (SOKEN TECHNICS KK) [A] 1-11 * See claims 1-2. * |