EP3542803 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPH OF TETRAARSENIC HEXOXIDE FOR USE IN PREVENTING OR TREATING BREAST CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/39] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING BREAST CANCER INCLUDING CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPH OF TETRAARSENIC HEXOXIDE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
[2022/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemas Co., Ltd. 3rd Fl. 502 Bongeunsa-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06163 / KR | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAE, Ill Ju 242-19, Nunkkotmaeul-gil Imgye-myeon Jeongseon-gun Gangwon-do 26112 / KR | 02 /
LIAN, Zenglin Rm 412 No.5 B/D Cuiweinanli Cuiwei Road Haidian District Beijing 100036 / CN | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 17872391.2 | 17.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017KR13148 | Priority number, date | KR20160155228 | 21.11.2016 Original published format: KR 20160155228 | [2019/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093215 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3542803 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3542803 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/36, A61K31/285, A61P35/04, C01G28/00 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
A61P35/04 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K33/36 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/285 (IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (CN);
C01G28/00 (IL);
C01G28/005 (EP,IL);
C01P2002/72 (EP,IL);
C01P2002/77 (EP,IL);
C01P2002/88 (EP);
C01P2006/80 (IL)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | A61K33/36, A61K31/285 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EIN KRISTALLINES POLYMORPH VON TETRAARSENHEXOXID ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBS | [2022/30] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPH OF TETRAARSENIC HEXOXIDE FOR USE IN PREVENTING OR TREATING BREAST CANCER | [2022/30] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN POLYMORPHE CRISTALLIN D'HEXOXYDE TÉTRAARSENIQUE POUR L'UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN | [2022/30] |
Former [2019/39] | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBS, EINSCHLIESSLICH KRISTALLINEM POLYMORPH VON TETRAARSENHEXOXID UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2019/39] | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING BREAST CANCER INCLUDING CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPH OF TETRAARSENIC HEXOXIDE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
Former [2019/39] | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DE PRÉVENTION OU DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN COMPRENANT UN POLYMORPHE CRISTALLIN D'HEXOXYDE DE TÉTRAARSENIC, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LADITE COMPOSITION | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | Translation filed | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | IT | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | NL | 21.12.2022 | PL | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SE | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
IT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002028253 (BAE ILL-JU [KR], et al) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * * tables 1,2 * * examples 1,2 * * example 3 * * table 5 * * examples 4,5 * * example 7 * * example 8 * * example 11 *; | [I] - MIN JEONG KIM ET AL, "Arsenic hexoxide enhances TNF-[alpha]-induced anticancer effects by inhibiting NF-[kappa]B activity at a safe dose in MCF-7 human breast cancer cells", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (20140501), vol. 31, no. 5, doi:10.3892/or.2014.3085, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 2305 - 2311, XP055701073 [I] 1-5 * the whole document * * page 2306, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2307, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 2310, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/or.2014.3085 | [A] - WON SUP LEE ET AL, "Tetraarsenic hexoxide demonstrates anticancer activity at least in part through suppression of NF-[kappa]B activity in SW620 human colon cancer cells", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (20150601), vol. 33, no. 6, doi:10.3892/or.2015.3890, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 2940 - 2946, XP055701054 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/or.2015.3890 | International search | [XA]KR100272835B (BAE IL JU [KR]) [X] 1, 3-5 * See examples 1, 2, 1]; and claim 1. * [A] 2; | [A]KR20040014813 (BAE IL JU, et al) [A] 1-5* See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20100054210 (CHONJISAN CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20100069204 (CHONJISAN CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20130110466 (OK KYOUNG YUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-5 * See the entire document. * | by applicant | KR100272835B |