EP3457101 - CONTACT FORCE MEASUREMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/12] | PRESSING FORCE MEASUREMENT METHOD | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMOTO, Yoichi C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
KATAYAMA, Masaaki C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 17872754.1 | 10.07.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017JP25111 | Priority number, date | JP20160225635 | 21.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016225635 | [2019/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018092352 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457101 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3457101 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/00, G01L1/12, G01N27/72, G21C17/003, G01L1/25, F22B37/00, G01B17/02, G01N29/11 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G01L1/255 (EP,US);
F22B37/003 (EP,US);
G01B17/02 (US);
G01L1/00 (US);
G01L1/005 (US);
G01L5/0033 (EP,US);
G01N27/72 (EP,US);
G01N27/90 (US);
G01N29/11 (US);
G21C17/003 (EP,US);
G21D1/00 (EP,US);
Y02E30/00 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | G01L5/00, G01L1/12, G01N27/72, G21C17/003 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTMESSVERFAHREN | [2020/04] | English: | CONTACT FORCE MEASUREMENT METHOD | [2020/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE FORCE DE CONTAKT | [2020/04] |
Former [2019/12] | PRESSKRAFTMESSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/12] | PRESSING FORCE MEASUREMENT METHOD | ||
Former [2019/12] | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE FORCE DE PRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2018 | Translation filed | 10.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 16.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2017 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | IE | 10.07.2020 | LU | 10.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | DE | 02.02.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.07.2017 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 10.07.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 10.07.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
DE | 02.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 10.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0243082 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [I] 1-8 * page 7, line 26 - page 13, line 28; figures 1-7 *; | [I]FR2745115 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]) [I] 1-8 * page 6, line 29 - page 18, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [A]KR20050001859 (DOOSAN HEAVY IND & CONSTR) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US2005154564 (LE QUI V [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2014030718 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1-8 * page 4, line 31 - page 11, line 30; figures 1-7 *; | [A]GB2529484 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]JPS60169757 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 7 * , entire text; fig. 2 to 4 & US 4528856 A Whole Document; fig. 2 to 4 * [A] 1-2; | [A]US4893671 (LAGALLY HERMANN O [US], et al) [A] 1-6* , column 4, line 62 to column 7, line 26; fig. 1 to 5 & US 4991645 A *; | [Y]JPH09257453 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 8 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0018] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH11264775 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [Y] 1-3, 6-8 * , paragraphs [0003] to [0004], [0007] to [0017]; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010197096 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0039]; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010230337 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO) [Y] 3, 6-8 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0030]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014041102 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-3, 6-8 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0008], [0034] to [0061]; fig. 1 to 7 & WO 2014/030718 A1 *; | [YA]JP2014048183 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0006], [0034] to [0066]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) * [A] 1-6, 8 | by applicant | JPS6293586U |