EP3541375 - FACTOR XIIA INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/39] | FACTOR XIIa INHIBITORS | ||
[2022/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Ashwin, U. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 02 /
MCKITTRICK, Brian Alexander 14 Millbrook Road New Vernon, New Jersey 07976 / US | 03 /
LOMBARDO, Matthew 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 04 /
HICKS, Jacqueline, D. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 05 /
MCCRACKEN, Amy Bittner 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 06 /
CHU, Hong Dong 21 Riker Hill Road Livingston, New Jersey 07039 / US | 07 /
SO, Sung-Sau 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 08 /
ORTH, Peter 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 09 /
WU, Zhicai 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 10 /
LAN, Ping 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 11 /
DEBENHAM, John, S. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 12 /
WHITEHEAD, Brent, R. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 13 /
TAYLOR, Jerry, A. 40 Division Street Trenton, New Jersey 08611 / US | 14 /
SUN, Zhongxiang 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 15 /
KATIPALLY, Revathi Reddy 23 Potomac Road Monmouth, New Jersey 08852 / US | 16 /
GABLE, Jonathan, E. 120 West 45th Street 17th Floor New York, New York 10036 / US | 17 /
DAHLGREN, Markus, K. 120 West 45th Street 17th Floor New York, New York 10036 / US | 18 /
BHAT, Sathesh, P. 120 West 45th Street 17th Floor New York, New York 10036 / US | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [2023/34] |
Former [2019/39] | Jaap, David Robert MSD Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17872824.2 | 13.11.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017US61222 | Priority number, date | US201662423844P | 18.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662423844 P | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018093695 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541375 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3541375 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/395, A61K31/495, A61K31/4965, C07D241/00, C07D241/02, C07D241/04, A61K45/06, A61P7/02, // C07D403/12, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, C07D413/04, C07D413/14, C07D495/04, A61P15/00 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP,US);
C07D241/04 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D409/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | A61K31/395, A61K31/495, A61K31/4965, C07D241/00, C07D241/02, C07D241/04, // C07D403/12, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, C07D413/04, C07D413/14, C07D495/04, A61P15/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/39] | A61K31/395, A61K31/495, A61K31/4965, C07D241/00, C07D241/02, C07D241/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAKTOR XIIA INHIBITOREN | [2022/44] | English: | FACTOR XIIA INHIBITORS | [2022/44] | French: | INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR XIIA | [2019/39] |
Former [2019/39] | FAKTOR-XIIA-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2019/39] | FACTOR XIIa INHIBITORS | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 06.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | LU | 13.11.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
LU | 13.11.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9857960 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11* page 4, line 5 - page 4, line 13; claim -; compound 246 *; | [A]WO2006113376 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0001]; compounds 65,70,73,82,88 *; | [X]WO2008016676 (CYTOKINETICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 75, 1st compound; paragraph [0002] * | International search | [A]US2008003214 (CEZANNE BERTRAM [DE], et al) [A] 1-6, 8-16 * entire document *; | [A]US2008287453 (BOWER JUSTIN FAIRFIELD [GB], et al) [A] 1-6, 8-16 * entire document' *; | [A]US2011033459 (CONLEY PAMELA B [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 8-16* entire document * | by applicant | US2008003214 | US2011033459 | - SHARIAT-MADAR et al., Blood, (20060000), vol. 108, pages 192 - 199 | - "Contact ActivationPathway", COLEMAN, R., Hemostasis and Thrombosis, Lippincott Williams & Wilkins, (20010000), pages 103 - 122 | - SCHMAIER, A.H., "Contact Activation", Thrombosis and Hemorrhage, (19980000), pages 105 - 128 | - RENNE et al., J Exp. Med., (20050000), vol. 202, pages 271 - 281 | - KLEINSCHMITZ et al., J Exp. Med., (20060000), vol. 203, pages 513 - 518 | - KENNE, E.RENNE, T., "Factor XII: a drug target for safe interference with thrombosis and inflammation", Drug DISCOvery Today, (20140000), vol. 19, pages 1459 - 146 | - RENNE, T. et al., "In vivo roles of factor XII", Blood, (20120000), vol. 120, doi:10.1182/blood-2012-, pages 4296 - 4303, XP055599576 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012- | - KLEINSCHNITZ, C. et al., "Targeting coagulation factor XII provides protection from pathological thrombosis in cerebral ischemia without interfering with hemostasis", Journal of Experimental Medicine, (20060000), vol. 203, doi:10.1084/jem.20052458, pages 513 - 518, XP055110912 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20052458 | - GRUBER, A. et al., Therapeutic antibodies against factor XII, Vanderbilt University, (20140000), page 91 | - WORM, M. et al., "The factor XIIa blocking antibody 3F7: a safe anticoagulant with anti inflammatory activities", Annals of Translational Medicine, (20150000), vol. 3, pages 241 - 245 | - CHENG, Q.TUCKER, E. I.PINE, M. S.SISLER, I.MATAFONOV, A.SUN, M.-F.WHITE-ADAMS, T. C.SMITH, S. A.HANSON, S. R.MCCARTY, O. J. T., "A role for factor XIIa-mediated factor XI activation in thrombus formation in vivo", Blood, (20100000), vol. 116, doi:10.1182/blood-2010-02-270918, pages 3981 - 3989, XP055355312 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2010-02-270918 | - GAILANI, D. et al., "Factor XI and contact activation as targets for antithrombotic therapy", Journal of Thrombosis andHaemostasis, (20150000), vol. 13, pages 1383 - 1395 | - CHOUTALALAY, Adv. Enzyme Regul., (19840000), vol. 22, pages 27 - 55 |