EP3545574 - ANODE SLURRY FOR SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRST International Limited Unit 212, 2/F, Photonics Centre No. 2 Science Park East Avenue Hong Kong Science Park Shatin Hong Kong / CN | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Kam Piu Unit 212, 2/F Photonics Centre No. 2 Science Park East Avenue Hong Kong Science Park Shatin New Territories Hong Kong / HK | 02 /
WANG, Ranshi Unit 212, 2/F Photonics Centre No. 2 Science Park East Avenue Hong Kong Science Park Shatin New Territories Hong Kong / HK | 03 /
SHEN, Peihua No.1 Building No.19 Street Fengxiangyuan Phoenix City, Xintang, Zengcheng Guangzhou Guangdong 511340 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Yingkai Unit 212, 2/F Photonics Centre No. 2 Science Park East Avenue Hong Kong Science Park Shatin New Territories Hong Kong / HK | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17873110.5 | 17.11.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017CN111632 | Priority number, date | US201662425619P | 23.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662425619 P | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018095283 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545574 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/13, H01M4/139, H01M4/38, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M10/052 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/133 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M4/13 (EP,US);
H01M4/134 (KR);
H01M4/139 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (US);
H01M4/1393 (KR,US);
H01M4/1395 (KR,US);
H01M4/364 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | H01M4/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | ANODENAUFSCHLÄMMUNG FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2019/40] | English: | ANODE SLURRY FOR SECONDARY BATTERY | [2019/40] | French: | BOUILLIE D'ANODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 12.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2012081838 (COSTANTINO HENRY R [US], et al) [I] 1,2,13,15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 47] , [0 76] , [0 84] - [0086] - [0 90] , [0 93] , [ 157 ] - [ 160] - [ 207] , [ 221] - [0225] * * claims 1, 2, 12, 30, 58 * [A] 3-12,14; | [A]GB2529411 (NEXEON LTD [GB]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [L]EP3545569 (GRST INT LTD [CN]) [L] 1-15 * claims 1-20 *; | [A] - CHAO ET AL, "Preparation and characterization of carbon cryogel (CC) and CC-SiO composite as anode material for lithium-ion battery", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071223), vol. 53, no. 9, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 3468 - 3473, XP022461313 [A] 1 * the whole document * |