Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019157682 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201716313884 | 17.11.2017 | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190082819 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019536234 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109983602 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3043254 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017364747 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3545574 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | A4 | EP3545574 | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201912783X | 30.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201824617 | 01.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 | WO2017CN111632 | 17.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018095283 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662425619 | 23.11.2016 |