EP3547014 - PINHOLE CONTACT LENS AND SMART CONTACT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal View Co., Ltd. 1-7-11, Hirakawa-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAKI Yu c/o Universal View Co. Ltd. 1-7-11 Hirakawa-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI Taro c/o Universal View Co. Ltd. 1-7-11 Hirakawa-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI Yoshio c/o Universal View Co. Ltd. 1-7-11 Hirakawa-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | 04 /
NAGAI Kenji c/o Universal View Co. Ltd. 1-7-11 Hirakawa-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | 05 /
HASHIMOTO Masaru c/o Universal View Co. Ltd. 1-7-11 Hirakawa-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17873592.4 | 14.11.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017JP40931 | Priority number, date | JP20160229109 | 25.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016229109 | JP20160251735 | 26.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016251735 | JP20170080269 | 14.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017080269 | [2019/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018096979 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3547014 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04, H04B1/3827 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
G02C7/04 (EP,KR,US);
G02C7/049 (US);
A61B3/14 (EP);
A61B3/16 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/043 (KR);
G02B5/00 (US);
G02C7/16 (EP,KR);
H04B1/3827 (KR,US);
A61B3/0008 (EP);
A61B5/6821 (US);
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02C11/10 (EP);
H04B1/385 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLENDENKONTAKTLINSE UND INTELLIGENTES KONTAKTSYSTEM | [2019/40] | English: | PINHOLE CONTACT LENS AND SMART CONTACT SYSTEM | [2019/40] | French: | LENTILLE DE CONTACT À TROU D'ÉPINGLE ET SYSTÈME DE CONTACT INTELLIGENT | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2019 | Translation filed | 11.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 30.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO2011048953 [y] (UNIVERSAL VISION CO LTD [JP], et al) [y] 1-23; | JP2013501598 [y] [y] 7,23; | JP2013218326 [y] (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE) [y] 17,23; | JP2014160258 [a] (KONNO HIKOYUKI) [a] 1-23; | WO2014178221 [y] (SONY CORP [JP]) [y] 1-23; | JP2015018179 [a] (UNIVERSAL VIEW CO LTD)[a] 1-23; | JP2015515115 [y] [y] 21,23; | JP2016002353 [y] (SONY CORP) [y] 1-23; | JP2016534767 [y] [y] 23 | by applicant | JPS4828000B | JPS5244092B | JP4752309B | JP2013122591 | US8608310 | US9158133 | US2016097940 | JP5992424B |