EP3482728 - DISPOSABLE WEARING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/20] | DISPOSABLE WEARABLE ITEM | ||
[2021/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKI, Hideaki c/o Technical Center Unicharm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Takuya c/o Technical Center Unicharm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 03 /
MATSUSHIMA, Yuta c/o Technical Center Unicharm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17873868.8 | 21.11.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017JP41784 | Priority number, date | JP20160226626 | 22.11.2016 Original published format: JP 2016226626 | JP20170223210 | 20.11.2017 Original published format: JP 2017223210 | [2019/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018097123 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3482728 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3482728 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/49, A61F13/496 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/49011 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/49061 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/49 (RU);
A61F13/49012 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/49019 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/53 (US);
A61F13/53743 (KR);
A61F13/514 (US);
A61F2013/49052 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | A61F13/49 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEGARTIKEL ZUM TRAGEN | [2021/44] | English: | DISPOSABLE WEARING ARTICLE | [2021/44] | French: | ARTICLE VESTIMENTAIRE JETABLE | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/20] | WEARABLE-EINWEGARTIKEL | ||
Former [2019/20] | DISPOSABLE WEARABLE ITEM | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2019 | Translation filed | 07.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 14.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2017 | AL | 02.02.2022 | AT | 02.02.2022 | CY | 02.02.2022 | CZ | 02.02.2022 | DK | 02.02.2022 | EE | 02.02.2022 | ES | 02.02.2022 | FI | 02.02.2022 | HR | 02.02.2022 | IT | 02.02.2022 | LT | 02.02.2022 | LV | 02.02.2022 | MC | 02.02.2022 | MK | 02.02.2022 | MT | 02.02.2022 | PL | 02.02.2022 | RO | 02.02.2022 | RS | 02.02.2022 | SE | 02.02.2022 | SI | 02.02.2022 | SK | 02.02.2022 | SM | 02.02.2022 | BG | 02.05.2022 | NO | 02.05.2022 | GR | 03.05.2022 | IS | 02.06.2022 | PT | 02.06.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 21.11.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
MK | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 21.11.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.11.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.02.2022 | |
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.02.2022 | |
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.02.2022 | |
NO | 02.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]AU2014345091 (UNICHARM CORP) [X] 1,3,5,7 * figures 1,2,4,5 * * claims 1,2 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0014] - [0032] - [0055] - [0061] * [A] 2,6[I] 4,8,9 | International search | [A]JP2010082364 (OJI NEPIA CO LTD, et al) [A] 7 * , paragraphs [0018], [0019], fig. 1, 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013138795 (OJI NEPIA CO LTD, et al) [A] 1* (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015516273 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY) [A] 1-9 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0017], [0032], [0034], [0039]-[0040] , fig. 1B, 1C & WO 2013/173299 A1, claim 1, page 6, lines 16-22, page 11, line 27 to page 12, line 3, page 12, line 32 to page 3, line 8 & US 2013/0310785 A1 * |