EP3545423 - OVERLOAD HANDLING IN A CONTENT DELIVERY NETWORK (CDN) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Level 3 Communications, LLC 1025 Eldorado Boulevard Broomfield, CO 80021 / US | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWTON, Christopher 981 Via Colinas Westlake Village, California 91362 / US | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/27] |
Former [2019/40] | Ford, Esther Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17874200.3 | 10.01.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017US12860 | Priority number, date | US201615360456 | 23.11.2016 Original published format: US201615360456 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018097850 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545423 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3545423 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/612, G06F15/16, G06F15/173 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L67/61 (EP,US);
G06F9/505 (EP,US);
H04L43/0876 (EP);
H04L43/16 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/80 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | G06F15/16, G06F15/173, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L12/26 | ||
Former IPC [2019/40] | G06F15/16, G06F15/173, H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERLASTHANDHABUNG IN EINEM INHALTSBEREITSTELLUNGSNETZWERK (CDN) | [2019/40] | English: | OVERLOAD HANDLING IN A CONTENT DELIVERY NETWORK (CDN) | [2019/40] | French: | GESTION DES SURCHARGES DANS UN RÉSEAU DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU (CDN) | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 05.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | LU | 10.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SI | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SI | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1049031 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0032] - [0047] - [0053] - [0063]; figures 1-4,7 * [Y] 8,12,15 [I] 4,5,9; | [IY]US2009319681 (FREELANDER JACK E [US], et al) [I] 1-3,6,7,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0 26] - [0036] *[Y] 8,12,15; | [X] - MUNDUR P ET AL, "Class-Based Access Control for Distributed Video-on-Demand Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, US, (20050701), vol. 15, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2005.848351, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 844 - 853, XP011135309 [X] 1-3,6,7,10,11,13,14 * Chapters IV and V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2005.848351 | International search | [Y]US2003046396 (RICHTER ROGER K [US], et al) [Y] 6, 7, 12 * entire document *; | [Y]US2005120131 (ALLEN ARTHUR D [US]) [Y] 2-7, 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 19 * entire document *; | [A]US2006015574 (SEED STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2009319681 (FREELANDER JACK E [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014372588 (NEWTON CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document * |