Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
17.02.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.06.2020 | Supplementary search report | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
19.06.2020 | Change - classification | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
19.06.2020 | Change - classification | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
07.02.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
26.11.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.09.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] |
06.09.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] |
12.08.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.12.2018 | Change - representative | |
24.12.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.06.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.06.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication |