Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11510320 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2022 | B2 | US2020315021 | 01.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016235054 | 02.12.2016 | WO2017JP43062 | 30.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102140001B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2020 | B1 | KR20190012206 | 08.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016235054 | 02.12.2016 | WO2017JP43062 | 30.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6644168B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2020 | B2 | JPWO2018101404 | 18.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016235054 | 02.12.2016 | WO2017JP43062 | 30.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109479375B | Global Dossier | 06.05.2022 | B | CN109479375 | 15.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016235054 | 02.12.2016 | WO2017JP43062 | 30.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3550943 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2020 | A4 | EP3550943 | 09.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016235054 | 02.12.2016 | WO2017JP43062 | 30.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018101404 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2016235054 | 02.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI698921B | 11.07.2020 | B | TW201826356 | 16.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016235054 | 02.12.2016 |