EP3550646 - UNDERCOAT LAYER FOR ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE, AND UNDERCOAT FOIL FOR ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Corporation 5-1, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-6119 / JP | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBANO Yuki c/o Materials Research Laboratories NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES Ltd. 488-6 Suzumi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-0052 / JP | 02 /
HATANAKA Tatsuya c/o Materials Research Laboratories NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES Ltd. 488-6 Suzumi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-0052 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMOTO Takuji c/o Materials Research Laboratories NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES Ltd. 488-6 Suzumi-cho Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-0052 / JP | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/39] |
Former [2019/41] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17875545.0 | 29.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017JP42749 | Priority number, date | JP20160235180 | 02.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016235180 | [2019/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018101305 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550646 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3550646 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M4/66, C01B32/158, C09D5/00, C09D5/24, C09D7/40, C09D201/00, H01G11/28, H01G11/78, H01M4/02, H01M50/531, H01M50/534, H01M50/536 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H01M50/534 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/667 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/158 (US);
C01B32/168 (EP);
C09D179/02 (US);
C09D201/00 (US);
C09D5/00 (US);
C09D5/24 (EP,US);
C09D7/40 (US);
C09D7/45 (US);
C09D7/61 (EP);
C09D7/65 (US);
C09D7/70 (US);
H01G11/28 (EP,US);
H01G11/36 (US);
H01G11/48 (US);
H01G11/68 (US);
H01G11/74 (US);
H01G11/78 (EP,US);
H01G11/84 (EP);
H01G11/86 (US);
H01M10/04 (US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M4/02 (US);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H01M4/66 (US);
H01M4/661 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/663 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/668 (KR,US);
H01M50/536 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
C08K2003/0812 (EP);
C08K2003/0893 (EP);
C08K2003/2241 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/22 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (KR);
Y02E60/13 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | H01M4/66, C01B32/158, C09D5/00, C09D5/24, C09D7/40, C09D201/00, H01G11/28, H01G11/78, H01M2/26, H01M4/02, H01M10/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NO, SE [2022/38] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRUNDIERUNGSSCHICHT FÜR ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND GRUNDIERUNGSFOLIE FÜR DIE ELEKTRODE DER ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2019/41] | English: | UNDERCOAT LAYER FOR ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE, AND UNDERCOAT FOIL FOR ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE ELECTRODE | [2019/41] | French: | SOUS-COUCHE POUR DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE, ET FEUILLE DE SOUS-COUCHE POUR ÉLECTRODE DE DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2019 | Translation filed | 07.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 23.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010025052 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-6,9-18 * claims 1-20 * [I] 7,8,19; | [XI]US2010273051 (CHOI HEE-SUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,9-18 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0049] * * claims 1-14 * [I] 8,19; | [XI]EP2680286 (JAPAN CAPACITOR IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,9-18 * paragraphs [0120] , [0121] * [I] 6,19; | [XI]EP2988351 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-18 * paragraph [0127] * * claims 1-5 * [I] 6,8,19; | [E]EP3386021 (NISSAN CHEMICAL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-19 * paragraphs [0114] - [0118] * * claims 1-11 *; | [E]EP3401981 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-19 * claims 1-8 * * paragraphs [0052] , [0086] - [0090] *; | [E]EP3401982 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-19 * claims 1-11 ** paragraphs [0051] , [0077] - [0081] - [0084] * | International search | [X]JP2003297696 (TDK CORP) [X] 1-3, 9-13, 16 * , claims, paragraphs [0018], [0061]-[0064], fig. 4 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2009283275 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-5, 9, 10, 12, 13, 16 * , claims, paragraphs [0032]-[0036], [0042] &WO 2009/141691 A2, claims, paragraphs [0038]-[0040], [0043] & KR 10-2010-0134128 A & CN 102037592 A *; | [XY]JP2013073906 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-7, 9-13, 16 * , claims, paragraphs [0016]-[0025], [0040], [0044], [0055]-[0058], [0062], [0070]-[0084], fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 7-19; | [Y]WO2014034113 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [Y] 13-19 * , claims, paragraph [0049], fig. 1-9 & US 2015/0213967 A1, claims, paragraph [0086], fig. 1-9 & EP 2892103 A1 & KR 10-2014-0048336 A & CN 103891029 A & TW 201419634 A *; | [XY]WO2014042080 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13, 16 * , claims, paragraphs [0016], [0040], [0046], [0061]-[0066] & US 2015/0228982 A1, claims, paragraphs [0042], [0043], [0090], [0106], [0183]-[0192] & EP 2897203 A1 & CN 104620429 A & KR 10-2015-0058303 A & TW 201424104 A * [Y] 7-19; | [A]JP2014216432 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0003], [0004] (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2015029949 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 7-19 * , paragraphs [0008], [0014], [0016]-[0019] & US 2016/0200850 A1, paragraphs [0016], [0029], [0035]-[0043] & EP 3040115 A1 & CN 105473216 A & KR 10-2016-0045792 A & TW 201521860 A *; | [PX]WO2016194747 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-19* , claims, paragraphs [0072]-[0125] & TW 201717453 A * | by applicant | JP2010170965 | WO2014004280 | WO2014034113 | WO2014042080 | WO2015029949 |