EP3549705 - HOT-AIR OXYGEN-FREE BRAZING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhang, Yue Room 348, Oriental Ginza 348 Broad Road Changsha, Hunan 410127 / CN | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17875829.8 | 29.08.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017CN99432 | Priority number, date | CN20161172348 | 29.11.2016 Original published format: CN201611072348 | CN201710379554 | 25.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710379554 | CN201710742327 | 25.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710742327 | [2019/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018099149 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549705 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/012, B23K1/008 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
B23K1/012 (EP,KR);
B23K1/008 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | SAUERSTOFFFREIES HEISSLUFTLÖTSYSTEM | [2019/41] | English: | HOT-AIR OXYGEN-FREE BRAZING SYSTEM | [2019/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BRASAGE À AIR CHAUD SANS OXYGÈNE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2018 | Translation filed | 26.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 22.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3685139 (EARLY JAMES R, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 42 - column 5, line 20; figures 1-4 * [I] 5,9-13,15; | [A]US4869470 (HEILMANN PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2001051323 (NISHIMURA MAKOTO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0012] , [0013] , [0014] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0060]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0062]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0073] - [0078] * [I] 5,9-13,15; | [XI]KR20120026164 (TSM CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0027] , [0028]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,9-13,15; | [XI]US2013001272 (KURIHARA MICHIYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0010] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0044] , [0049] , [0050]; figures 1A,2A,2B * * paragraphs [0056] , [0057]; figure 4B * [I] 5,9-13,15 | International search | [A]US4278421 (LIMQUE FERDINAND, et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US4327271 (BENTLEY PETER D, et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [XY]CN1033840 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 16, 11-19 * , description, pages 3-6, and figures 1-2, description, pages 3-6, and figures 1-2 * [Y] 7-10, 20; | [A]JPH03133198 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]CN1377221 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [Y]CN202326371U (SUZHOU WEIYI FLUID TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 7-10, 20 * , description, paragraphs 15-17, and figure 1 * |