EP3547931 - BIOABSORBABLE DEFORMABLE ANCHORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acuitive Technologies, Inc. 50 Commerce Drive Allendale, NJ 07401 / US | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOWAYLO, Alex 10802 Est Cortile Court Naples, FL 34110 / US | 02 /
McCARTHY, Michael P. 54 Jacquelin Avenue Ho-Ho-Kus, NJ 07423 / US | 03 /
FERREIRA, Rui J. 6 Coddington Terrace Livingston, NJ 07052 / US | 04 /
KRIJGER, Peter 879 Green Pond Road Rockaway, NJ 07866 / US | 05 /
TRAN, Minh-Tuan Richard 2 Gordon Road Ho-Ho-Kus, NJ 07423 / US | 06 /
GABEL, Douglas William 16 Atwood Avenue Pompton Plains, NJ 07444 / US | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 17875898.3 | 10.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017US61068 | Priority number, date | US201662428323P | 30.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662428323 P | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018102104 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3547931 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61L31/12, A61F2/08 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP);
A61F2/0811 (US);
A61L31/127 (EP);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0403 (EP);
A61B2017/0409 (EP);
A61B2017/0412 (EP);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0424 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0425 (EP);
A61B2017/0438 (EP);
A61B2017/0445 (US);
A61F2002/0835 (US);
A61F2002/0852 (US);
A61F2002/0888 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | A61B17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | BIORESORBIERBARE VERFORMBARE ANKER | [2019/41] | English: | BIOABSORBABLE DEFORMABLE ANCHORS | [2019/41] | French: | ANCRES DÉFORMABLES BIO-ABSORBABLES | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014193356 (YANG JIAN [US]) | International search | [A]US2008208264 (LAZAROF SARGON [US]) [A] 1-12, 17-18, 21-22, 25- 33, 36, 39, 46, 63* ; entire document. *; | [XY]US2010082072 (SYBERT DARYL R [US], et al) [X] 1-12, 17-18, 21-22, 25- 27, 46, 63 * ; entire document, especially para [0121], [0153], [0156], [0159]-[0160], [0196], and Fig. 2A-B, 4B, and 6. * [Y] 28-33, 36, 39; | [A]US2011071579 (REACH JR JOHN S [US]) [A] 1-12, 17-18, 21-22, 25- 33, 36, 39, 46, 63 * ; entire document. *; | [A]US2012265258 (GARVEY BRIAN [US]) [A] 1-12, 17-18, 21-22, 25- 33, 36, 39, 46, 63 * ; entire document. *; | [Y]US2014155516 (AMEER GUILLERMO [US], et al) [Y] 28-33, 36, 39 * ; especially para [0005], [0012]-[0013], and [0024]. * |