EP3507826 - BONDED WAFER METROLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kla-Tencor Corporation Legal Department One Technology Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2019/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAH, Kaushik Waterlelieplein 5 B-301 3010 Kessel Lo / BE | 02 /
KRAH, Thomas Schmidtstr. 312 61169 Friedberg / DE | 03 /
LI, Shifang 3357 Sagewood Court Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 04 /
EISENBACH, Heiko Gaeuchen 14 65604 Elz / DE | 05 /
STOERRING, Moritz Landbouwstraat 88 B-1030 Brussels / BE | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 17876339.7 | 27.11.2017 | [2019/28] | WO2017US63310 | Priority number, date | US201662427373P | 29.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662427373 P | US201715627834 | 20.06.2017 Original published format: US201715627834 | [2019/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018102260 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3507826 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66, G06T7/13, G06T7/60, G06T7/73, G06T7/00, G01B11/24 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP,US);
H01L22/30 (KR);
G01B11/002 (US);
G01B11/2433 (EP,US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06T7/60 (EP,US);
G06T7/73 (EP,US);
H01L22/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01L22/24 (KR);
G01B2210/56 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20061 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30148 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | H01L21/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | GEBONDETE WAFERMETROLOGIE | [2019/28] | English: | BONDED WAFER METROLOGY | [2019/28] | French: | MÉTROLOGIE DE TRANCHE LIÉE | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 07.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012195490 (LANGMANS ELDAD [IL], et al) [A] 9 * abstract ** paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0019] *; | [XI]US2013139950 (KANNAKA MASATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,11,13-15 * abstract * * figures 3,4,5,6,7 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0062] * [I] 9,10,12 | International search | [A]US2006109484 (AKAMATSU MASARU [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 32-35 and figures 3-6B. *; | [A]US2009142916 (PRENZ HEIKE [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs 40-41 and figures 9-10B. *; | [A]US2010134615 (AKAMATSU MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 73-87 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2013054154 (BROEKAART MARCEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 81-100, claims 19-33 and figures 2-7. *; | [A]US2013100441 (TAGAWA YUTA [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs 40-56 and figures 6-8. * | by applicant | US2013139950 | US8629902 |