|
22.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2021 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.06.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
36 |