02.04.2022 |
Refusal of application |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
13.12.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
10.12.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
29.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.04.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.12.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.03.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.02.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
20.12.2019 |
First examination report |
|
14.12.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.05.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
26.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
26.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.02.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
15.02.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.02.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
10.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.12.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
14.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|