Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10996052 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2021 | B2 | US2018156607 | 07.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715807552 | 08.11.2017 | US201662430269 | 05.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109476285B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2021 | B | CN109476285 | 15.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN107615 | 25.10.2017 | US201662430269 | 05.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3455110 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2019 | A4 | EP3455110 | 20.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017CN107615 | 25.10.2017 | US201662430269 | 05.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018103467 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662430269 | 05.12.2016 |