EP3553460 - CRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tadano Ltd. Ko-34, Shindencho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA Iwao c/o TADANO Ltd. Ko-34 Shinden-cho Takamatsu-shi Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | 02 /
TAMAKI Keisuke c/o TADANO Ltd. Ko-34 Shinden-cho Takamatsu-shi Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 17877886.6 | 08.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017JP44235 | Priority number, date | JP20160239909 | 09.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016239909 | [2019/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018105742 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553460 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3553460 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, G01B21/04, G01B11/24, G01C3/06, B66C23/88, B66C13/00, B66C13/48, H04N7/18 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G01B11/24 (EP);
B66C13/48 (EP,US);
B60R1/002 (US);
B66C13/00 (EP);
B66C23/88 (EP);
G01B21/045 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/35] | G01B11/00, B66C13/00, B66C23/88, G01C3/06, G01B11/24, G01B21/04 | ||
Former IPC [2019/42] | G01B11/00, B66C13/00, B66C23/88, G01C3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAN | [2019/42] | English: | CRANE | [2019/42] | French: | GRUE | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2019 | Translation filed | 05.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 09.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | LU | 08.12.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
IT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2009326734 (GUDAT ADAM J [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4; | [XA]US2014107971 (ENGEDAL TORBJØRN [NO], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4; | [IA]WO2015154508 (ZOOMLION HEAVY IND SCI & TECH [CN], et al) [I] 1-3 * the whole document *[A] 4 | International search | [A]JP2007225342 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0042]-[0048] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2009198382 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1, 4 * , paragraphs [0015], [0016], [0026]-[0028], [0031], [0065] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 3; | [A]WO2013006625 (TRIMBLE NAVIGATION LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-4* , paragraphs [0075] - [0092] & US 2013/0013251 A1 & DE 112012000169 T5 & CN 103298728 A *; | [A]JP3184777U (TOKYO TSUSHINKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0009]-[0031], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [YA]WO2014046213 (TADANO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1, 4 * , paragraphs [0023]-[0062], fig. 1-13 & US 2015/0249821 A1, paragraphs [0057]-[0098], fig. 1-13 & EP 2899496 A1 & CN 104662389 A & JP 2014-169184 A & JP 2014-151979 A * [A] 2, 3; | [YA]WO2015198410 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,4 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0031], fig. 1-12 7 US 2017/0146343 A1, paragraphs [0025]-[0042], fig. 1-12 * [A] 2, 3; | [A]JP2016175766 (TADANO LTD) [A] 1-4 * , paragraph [0025] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH0853290 |