Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10686445 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | B2 | US2020067510 | 27.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US65413 | 08.12.2017 | US201716467395 | 08.12.2017 | US201662432374 | 09.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110178310 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US65413 | 08.12.2017 | US201662432374 | 09.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3542464 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2020 | A4 | EP3542464 | 25.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US65413 | 08.12.2017 | US201662432374 | 09.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018107090 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662432374 | 09.12.2016 |