EP3554159 - METHOD FOR SUPPORTING PLURALITY OF TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyunho IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
YI, Yunjung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Daesung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 17878856.8 | 01.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017KR13978 | Priority number, date | US201662432690P | 11.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662432690 P | US201762505104P | 11.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762505104 P | US201762506564P | 15.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762506564 P | US201762535948P | 23.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762535948 P | US201762561721P | 22.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762561721 P | [2019/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018105953 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3554159 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3554159 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/22, H04W72/04 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04L5/0082 (US);
H04L5/001 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/42] | H04W72/04, H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSZEITINTERVALLEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2019/42] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPORTING PLURALITY OF TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2019/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRISE EN CHARGE D'UNE PLURALITÉ D'INTERVALLES DE TEMPS DE TRANSMISSION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2018 | Translation filed | 03.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | MC | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | LU | 01.12.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015174904 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 33 * * page 16, line 32 - page 17, line 15 *; | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO INC, "Views on processing time reduction and related procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1612698, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051176641 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Consideration on support of CA operation for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160813), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-166923 NR SUPPORT OF CA OPERATION_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86/Docs/, (20160813), XP051132967 [Y] 7 * the whole document * | [XP] - NOKIA ET AL, "sTTI UE capability and configurability for carrier aggregation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1712945, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051315755 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR101475071B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0020]; and claims 1-6. *; | [Y]US8787921 (WU CHIH-HSIANG [TW]) [Y] 1-3, 5, 11-13, 15 * See column 5, line 32-column 6, line 26; and claims 1-6. *; | [A]WO2016159730 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [130]-[138]; and claims 1-8. *; | [YA] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on sTTI Operations", Rl-1611771, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #87, Reno, USA, (20161105), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_87/Docs, XP051190137 [Y] 1-3, 5, 11-13, 15 * See sections 1-3. * [A] 4, 6-10, 14, 16-20 | [A] - ERICSSON, "sTTI Lengths Combination in Case of CA", R1-1611510, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #87, Reno, USA, (20161104), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSCTR1_87/Docs, XP051189108 [A] 1-20 * See sections 1-3. * | [A] - ITR I, "Discussion on CA System Supporting sTTI Operation", R1-161 2194, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #87, Reno, USA, (20161104), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_87/Docs, XP051189204 [A] 1-20 * See sections 1-3. * |