EP3378866 - AMINE COMPOUND, MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER COMPRISING FUNCTIONAL GROUP DERIVED FROM SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang Mi LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
SOHN, Hae Sung LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Heung Yeal LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KIM, No Ma LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 17879654.6 | 28.12.2017 | [2018/39] | WO2017KR15670 | Priority number, date | KR20170002435 | 06.01.2017 Original published format: KR 20170002435 | KR20170147884 | 08.11.2017 Original published format: KR 20170147884 | [2018/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018128330 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3378866 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C08C19/22, C08C19/25, C08C19/44, C08F36/04, C08F4/46, C08F2/06, // C08F236/10, C08F212/08, C08F4/48, C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08K3/36, C08K3/06 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
C07F7/1804 (EP,KR,US);
C08C19/25 (EP,KR,US);
C08C19/22 (EP,KR);
C08C19/44 (EP,KR,US);
C08F36/04 (KR);
C08F8/32 (KR);
C08F8/42 (KR);
C08K5/5477 (KR);
C08K5/549 (KR);
C08L15/00 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/10, C08F2/06 (EP);
C08F236/10, C08F4/48 (EP);
C08L15/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K5/3437, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K5/47, C08K3/06 (EP);
C08F236/06, C08F212/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2018/39] | C07F7/18, C08K5/544, C08K5/549, C08F36/04, C08F8/32, C08F8/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | AMINVERBINDUNG, MODIFIZIERTES KONJUGIERTES DIENPOLYMER MIT DARAUS GEWONNENER FUNKTIONELLEN GRUPPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MODIFIZIERTEN KONJUGIERTEN DIENPOLYMERS | [2018/39] | English: | AMINE COMPOUND, MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER COMPRISING FUNCTIONAL GROUP DERIVED FROM SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED CONJUGATED DIENE POLYMER | [2018/39] | French: | COMPOSÉ D'AMINE, POLYMÈRE DE DIÈNE CONJUGUÉ MODIFIÉ COMPRENANT UN GROUPE FONCTIONNEL DÉRIVÉ DE CELUI-CI, ET MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMÈRE DE DIÈNE CONJUGUÉ MODIFIÉ | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2018 | Translation filed | 19.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 19.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3101036 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-4; claims 1-11; table 1 * * preparation examples 1-4;; tables 2-3 ** sentences 0091-0092 * | International search | [A]KR20080098589 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15; | [A]KR20160149801 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2016208739 (ZEON CORP [JP])[A] 1-15; | [A] - LAZAREVA, N. F., "Dehydrochlorination of chloroform by N-methyl- N,N-bis(silatranylmethyl)amine", Russian Chemical Bulletin, (20110300), pages 598 - 600, XP019947955 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11172-011-0095-x | [A] - SOROKIN, M. S., "Selenium-and tellurium-containing silatrane derivatives having an ECH2Si fragment (E = Se, Te", Russian Journal of General Chemistry, (20060000), pages 461 - 468, XP019301329 [A] 1-15 |