18.10.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
07.07.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
24.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
13.03.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
25.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.01.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
04.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
04.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
24.08.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
24.08.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.08.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
04.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
07.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|